Umbrella Enterprise Limited, a registered company, was registered on 10 Oct 2005. 9429034503614 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Vivek Sharma - an active director whose contract started on 10 Oct 2005,
Carol Denise Sharma - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Oct 2005 and was terminated on 13 Oct 2015.
Last updated on 29 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 39 O'neills Road, Swanson, Auckland, 0614 (types include: registered, service).
Umbrella Enterprise Limited had been using 511 Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland as their registered address until 26 May 2022.
More names for this company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 22 Sep 2014 to 12 Mar 2020 they were named Service King Limited, from 26 Oct 2010 to 22 Sep 2014 they were named Sync Nationwide Limited and from 19 Nov 2009 to 26 Oct 2010 they were named Facility Services Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders (3 groups). The first group is comprised of 98 shares (98%) held by 3 entities. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (1%). Lastly the next share allotment (1 share 1%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 511 Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland, 1026 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 08 Oct 2019 to 26 May 2022
Address #2: 22 Catherine Street, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 27 Jun 2016 to 08 Oct 2019
Address #3: 725 Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland, 1026 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Jul 2012 to 27 Jun 2016
Address #4: 80 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 22 Mar 2012 to 04 Jul 2012
Address #5: Level 2, 725 Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland, 1026 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 15 Oct 2010 to 22 Mar 2012
Address #6: C/-symmetry Limited, Chartered Accountants, Level 2, 725 Rosebank Road, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 Nov 2009 to 15 Oct 2010
Address #7: Oswin Griffiths -dfk Limited, Level 4, 52 Symonds Street, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 30 Mar 2009 to 17 Nov 2009
Address #8: 39 O'neils Road, Swanson
Registered address used from 06 Nov 2006 to 30 Mar 2009
Address #9: 39 Oneils Road, Swanson, Auckland
Physical address used from 02 Oct 2006 to 30 Mar 2009
Address #10: 7 Thomas Avenue, Te Atatu Peninsula, Auckland
Physical address used from 10 Oct 2005 to 02 Oct 2006
Address #11: 7 Thomas Avenue, Te Atatu Peninsula, Auckland
Registered address used from 10 Oct 2005 to 06 Nov 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 17 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 98 | |||
Director | Sharma, Vivek |
Swanson Auckland 0614 New Zealand |
28 Feb 2017 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Arsm Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030521018 |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
28 Feb 2017 - |
Individual | Sharma, Carol Denise |
Swanson Auckland 0614 New Zealand |
10 Oct 2005 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Sharma, Vivek |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
28 Feb 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Sharma, Carol Denise |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
10 Oct 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Sharma, Vick |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
10 Oct 2005 - 28 Feb 2017 |
Vivek Sharma - Director
Appointment date: 10 Oct 2005
Address: Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Sep 2012
Address: Swanson, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Oct 2018
Carol Denise Sharma - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Oct 2005
Termination date: 13 Oct 2015
Address: Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Sep 2012
Norwest Wholesale Limited
22 Catherine Street
West City Motor Sport Limited
22 Catherine Street
Riddell Developments Limited
22 Catherine Street
Railedge Developments Limited
22 Catherine Street
Howe Singh Investments Limited
22 Catherine Street
On2it Builders Limited
22 Catherine Street