Chelm Holdings Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 10 Nov 2005. 9429034455937 is the NZBN it was issued. "Retailing nec" (business classification G427960) is how the company has been classified. The company has been managed by 5 directors: Eric William Judd - an active director whose contract started on 07 Jul 2009,
Logan Spencer William Judd - an inactive director whose contract started on 29 Jul 2013 and was terminated on 01 Nov 2018,
Caleb Benjamin Judd - an inactive director whose contract started on 15 Sep 2011 and was terminated on 18 Sep 2017,
Allan Vincent Spear - an inactive director whose contract started on 07 Jul 2009 and was terminated on 15 Sep 2011,
Margaret Ann Judd - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Nov 2005 and was terminated on 01 Mar 2010.
Last updated on 30 Jul 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 3 addresses this company registered, specifically: 251 Shirriffs Road, Awapuni, Palmerston North, 4412 (physical address),
251 Shirriffs Road, Awapuni, Palmerston North, 4412 (registered address),
251 Shirriffs Road, Awapuni, Palmerston North, 4412 (service address),
251 Shirriffs Road, Awapuni, Palmerston North, 4412 (other address) among others.
Chelm Holdings Limited had been using 201 Shirriffs Road, Awapuni, Palmerston North as their physical address until 16 Dec 2019.
Previous names used by this company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 10 Nov 2005 to 10 Jul 2006 they were called The Keto Clinic (North Shore) Fn1005 Limited.
A total of 5000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 1 share (0.02%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 4999 shares (99.98%).
Principal place of activity
251 Shirriffs Road, Awapuni, Palmerston North, 4412 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 201 Shirriffs Road, Awapuni, Palmerston North, 4412 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 14 Nov 2016 to 16 Dec 2019
Address #2: 1156a Kairanga-bunnythorpe Road, Rd5, Palmerston North, 4475 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Nov 2013 to 14 Nov 2016
Address #3: 8 Wright Road, Rd4, Albany, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Nov 2005 to 11 Nov 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 5000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 21 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Judd, Margaret Ann |
Palmerston North 4412 New Zealand |
22 Mar 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 4999 | |||
Individual | Judd, Eric William |
Awapuni Palmerston North 4412 New Zealand |
10 Nov 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Spear, Allan Vincent |
Browns Bay Auckland New Zealand |
07 Jul 2009 - 16 Sep 2011 |
Individual | Judd, Caleb Benjamin |
Awapuni Palmerston North 4412 New Zealand |
16 Sep 2011 - 22 Mar 2021 |
Individual | Judd, Margaret Ann |
Albany Auckland |
10 Nov 2005 - 01 Apr 2008 |
Eric William Judd - Director
Appointment date: 07 Jul 2009
Address: Awapuni, Palmerston North, 4412 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 2017
Address: Rd5, Palmerston North, 4475 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Aug 2013
Logan Spencer William Judd - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jul 2013
Termination date: 01 Nov 2018
Address: Awapuni, Palmerston North, 4412 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 2017
Address: Torbay, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jul 2013
Caleb Benjamin Judd - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Sep 2011
Termination date: 18 Sep 2017
Address: Rd 5, Palmerston North, 4475 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 2015
Allan Vincent Spear - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Jul 2009
Termination date: 15 Sep 2011
Address: Browns Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 07 Jul 2009
Margaret Ann Judd - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Nov 2005
Termination date: 01 Mar 2010
Address: Rd 4, Albany, 0794 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Jan 2010
N & R Paki Out Of School Care Limited
Shirriffs Rd
Kartsport Manawatu Incorporated
Shirriffs Road
Nora Property Limited
196 Shirriffs Road
Tankway Productions Limited
196 Shirriffs Road
Nora Property (2013) Limited
194 Shirriffs Road
Build Manawatu Builders Limited
194 Shirriffs Road
Aamt Limited
217a Featherston Street
Aaron & Willoughby Limited
74 Bourke Street
C & F Shine Limited
19a College Street
French Pear Gifts Limited
Level 8, Fmg House
M & J Farrier Supplies Limited
296 Queens Street
The Foam And Rubber Store Limited
63 Grey Street