Dion Morrell Shearing Limited was registered on 21 Nov 2005 and issued an NZBN of 9429034434598. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Dion Morrell - an active director whose contract began on 21 Nov 2005,
Gabriela Schmidt-Morrell - an active director whose contract began on 21 Nov 2005.
As stated in BizDb's information (updated on 16 Aug 2024), this company filed 1 address: 50D Centennial Avenue, Alexandra, 9320 (type: registered, physical).
Until 26 Nov 2021, Dion Morrell Shearing Limited had been using Level 2, 77 Centennial Avenue, Alexandra as their physical address.
A total of 10000 shares are issued to 3 groups (4 shareholders in total). In the first group, 5 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Schmidt-Morrell, Gabriela Elisabeth (an individual) located at Rd 1, Alexandra postcode 9391.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 0.05% shares (exactly 5 shares) and includes
Morrell, Dion James - located at Rd 1, Alexandra.
The third share allotment (9990 shares, 99.9%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Morrell, Dion James, located at Rd 1, Alexandra (an individual),
Schmidt-Morrell, Gabriela Elisabeth, located at Rd 1, Alexandra (an individual). Dion Morrell Shearing Limited is categorised as "Shearing services" (ANZSIC A052220).
Previous addresses
Address: Level 2, 77 Centennial Avenue, Alexandra, 9320 New Zealand
Physical address used from 16 Feb 2021 to 26 Nov 2021
Address: Level 2, 77 Centennial Avenue, Alexandra, 9320 New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 Feb 2020 to 26 Nov 2021
Address: Level 2, 77 Centennial Avenue, Alexandra, 9320 New Zealand
Registered address used from 05 Jul 2011 to 21 Feb 2020
Address: Level 2, 77 Centennial Avenue, Alexandra, 9320 New Zealand
Physical address used from 05 Jul 2011 to 16 Feb 2021
Address: 48 Bringans St, Alexandra New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Feb 2008 to 05 Jul 2011
Address: 20 Orchard Street, Clyde
Registered & physical address used from 21 Nov 2005 to 01 Feb 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: February
Financial report filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 08 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Individual | Schmidt-morrell, Gabriela Elisabeth |
Rd 1 Alexandra 9391 New Zealand |
21 Nov 2005 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Individual | Morrell, Dion James |
Rd 1 Alexandra 9391 New Zealand |
21 Nov 2005 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 9990 | |||
Individual | Morrell, Dion James |
Rd 1 Alexandra 9391 New Zealand |
21 Nov 2005 - |
Individual | Schmidt-morrell, Gabriela Elisabeth |
Rd 1 Alexandra 9391 New Zealand |
21 Nov 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Central Lodge Trustees 2006 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034249765 Company Number: 1784424 |
28 Aug 2014 - 14 Jun 2017 | |
Entity | Central Lodge Trustees 2006 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034249765 Company Number: 1784424 |
28 Aug 2014 - 14 Jun 2017 |
Dion Morrell - Director
Appointment date: 21 Nov 2005
Address: Rd 1, Alexandra, 9391 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Jun 2017
Gabriela Schmidt-morrell - Director
Appointment date: 21 Nov 2005
Address: Rd 1, Alexandra, 9391 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Jun 2017
Gibson Watson Consulting Limited
77 Centennial Avenue
Make It Your Business Limited
77 Centennial Avenue
Glencarron Ventures Limited
Level 2
Fraser Park Limited
77 Centennial Avenue
Athletics Alexandra Incorporated
Level 2
Ck Shearing Limited
264 Strode Road
Lyon Shearing Limited
Level 2
M & D Shearing Limited
22 Traford Street
Mouse O'neill Shearing Limited
Level 2
South West Shearing Limited
38 Irvine Street
Southern Heights Limited
24 Mathesons Corner Road