Oldage Trustees Limited, a registered company, was started on 18 Aug 2006. 9429033959269 is the NZBN it was issued. "Investment - financial assets" (ANZSIC K624040) is how the company was categorised. This company has been run by 1 director, named Andrew Lloyd Clifford Butler - an active director whose contract started on 18 Aug 2006.
Updated on 27 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 1 Joseph Senior Way, Ruby Bay, Mapua, 7005 (category: physical, registered).
Oldage Trustees Limited had been using 3 Lordship Place, Templeton, Christchurch as their registered address up to 08 Nov 2016.
Former names used by the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 18 Aug 2006 to 16 Sep 2016 they were called A & S Nominees Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 50 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Previous addresses
Address: 3 Lordship Place, Templeton, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 13 May 2013 to 08 Nov 2016
Address: Ashton Wheelans & Hegan Limited, 6 Lancaster Street, Waltham, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 31 May 2011 to 13 May 2013
Address: Ashton Wheelans & Hegan Limited, 4th Floor, 127 Armagh Street, Christchurch New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Nov 2007 to 31 May 2011
Address: Level 6, 135 Broadway, Newmarket
Physical & registered address used from 18 Aug 2006 to 06 Nov 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 04 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Butler, Susan May |
Ruby Bay Mapua 7005 New Zealand |
18 Aug 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Butler, Andrew Lloyd Clifford |
Ruby Bay Mapua 7005 New Zealand |
18 Aug 2006 - |
Andrew Lloyd Clifford Butler - Director
Appointment date: 18 Aug 2006
Address: Ruby Bay, Mapua, 7005 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Sep 2017
Southern Ballet Theatre Trust
Ashton Wheelans & Hegan
Mawhera Matauraka Trust
Messrs Ashton Wheelans & Hegan
Simplex Cc Trading Limited
83 Victoria Street
Annandale Enterprises Limited
83 Victoria Street
Ideal Tyre Imports 2013 Limited
Level 2
Kpi Group 196 Limited
Level 2
Douglas Ziffel & Smoot (new York) Limited
Level 2
Du Vin Investments Limited
Level 5 34-36 Cranmer Square
M25 Limited
Ashton Wheelans & Hegan Limited
Montrose Land Holdings Limited
Flat 1
Plant Investments Limited
Level 2
Pw Fibres Limited
Level 2