Ikitchen Limited, a registered company, was started on 10 Nov 2006. 9429033782249 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Kenneth Geoffrey Olsen - an active director whose contract began on 10 Nov 2006,
Daniel Peter Grice - an active director whose contract began on 01 Apr 2017.
Last updated on 03 Sep 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 60 Lake Road, Narrow Neck, Auckland, 0624 (types include: registered, physical).
Ikitchen Limited had been using 56 King Edward Parade, Devonport, Auckland as their registered address up until 23 Oct 2020.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders (4 groups). The first group is comprised of 1 share (0.1 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 2 shareholders in control of 798 shares (79.8 per cent). Finally the third share allocation (200 shares 20 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address: 56 King Edward Parade, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Oct 2020
Address: 18a Buchanan Street, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 Oct 2013 to 01 Jul 2015
Address: 50 Wairoa Road, Devonport, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 02 Oct 2009 to 10 Oct 2013
Address: 11 Oxford Terrace, Devonport, Auckland 0624
Physical & registered address used from 11 Sep 2008 to 02 Oct 2009
Address: 28 Bayswater Avenue, Devonport, Auckland 1309
Registered & physical address used from 10 Nov 2006 to 11 Sep 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 21 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Olsen, Kenneth Geoffrey |
Narrow Neck Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
10 Nov 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 798 | |||
Individual | Olsen, Kenneth Geoffrey |
Narrow Neck Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
10 Nov 2006 - |
Individual | Olsen, Karen |
Narrow Neck Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
10 Nov 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 200 | |||
Director | Grice, Daniel Peter |
Lower Shotover Queenstown 9304 New Zealand |
22 Mar 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Olsen, Karen |
Narrow Neck Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
10 Nov 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Hill, Noel |
Narrow Neck Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
10 Nov 2006 - 06 Oct 2017 |
Kenneth Geoffrey Olsen - Director
Appointment date: 10 Nov 2006
Address: Narrow Neck, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Sep 2021
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jun 2015
Daniel Peter Grice - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2017
Address: Lower Shotover, Queenstown, 9304 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Sep 2021
Address: Frankton, Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2017
Weyba Investments Limited
7 Morrison Avenue
Lines Design Limited
60a Wairoa Road
Puzzle-box Software Limited
42 Wairoa Road
Eastman Limited
64 Wairoa Road
Raccoon Beverages Limited
Flat 5, 6 North Avenue
Viewfield Properties Limited
17 North Avenue