Coldrick Roofing Limited was launched on 26 Feb 2007 and issued a number of 9429033592770. This registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Greg Hayden Coldrick - an active director whose contract started on 26 Feb 2007,
Kelli Lee Coldrick - an inactive director whose contract started on 26 Feb 2007 and was terminated on 12 Feb 2016.
According to BizDb's database (updated on 10 Sep 2024), this company registered 3 addresses: 198 Carmichael Road, Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 (physical address),
198 Carmichael Road, Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 (service address),
198 Carmichael Road, Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 (registered address),
Po Box 15467, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (postal address) among others.
Until 29 Apr 2020, Coldrick Roofing Limited had been using 88 Te Puna Road, Rd 4, Tauranga as their physical address.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 2 groups (3 shareholders in total). In the first group, 999 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
O'sheas Trustees No.6 Limited (an entity) located at Hamilton,
Coldrick, Greg Hayden (an individual) located at Bethlehem, Tauranga postcode 3110.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 0.1% shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Coldrick, Greg Hayden - located at Bethlehem, Tauranga. Coldrick Roofing Limited was classified as "Guttering installation or repair - roof" (business classification E323130).
Principal place of activity
198 Carmichael Road, Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 88 Te Puna Road, Rd 4, Tauranga, 3174 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 13 Apr 2015 to 29 Apr 2020
Address #2: 39 Balmoral Terrace, Otumoetai, Tauranga New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 Apr 2009 to 13 Apr 2015
Address #3: 3b Dunrobbin Pl, Gate Pa, Tauranga
Registered & physical address used from 15 Apr 2008 to 17 Apr 2009
Address #4: 1/66 Howard Hunter Avenue, St Johns, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 26 Feb 2007 to 15 Apr 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 16 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 999 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | O'sheas Trustees No.6 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032686838 |
Hamilton New Zealand |
09 Mar 2021 - |
Individual | Coldrick, Greg Hayden |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
26 Feb 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Coldrick, Greg Hayden |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
26 Feb 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Coldrick, Kelli Lee |
Rd 4 Tauranga 3174 New Zealand |
26 Feb 2007 - 04 Apr 2017 |
Greg Hayden Coldrick - Director
Appointment date: 26 Feb 2007
Address: Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Feb 2020
Address: Rd 4, Tauranga, 3174 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2015
Kelli Lee Coldrick - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Feb 2007
Termination date: 12 Feb 2016
Address: Rd 4, Tauranga, 3174 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2015
Furry Fruit Holdings Limited
112 Te Puna Road
Glencoe Marine Limited
58 Te Puna Road
Bay Of Plenty Touch Association Incorporated
C/- Pam Hyde
Ashley Nominees Limited
44 Armstrong Road
Sweep Kings Limited
2b Armstrong Road
New Season Holdings Limited
297 Te Puna Station Road
Armchair Investments Limited
23 Myres Street
Kiwispout Nz Limited
57 Balmedie Ridge
New Zealand Gutter Protection Limited
109b Main Road
Onsite Spouting Limited
C/-rachel Wilson Limited
Pc Roofing Limited
40 Karewa Parade
Shoreline Spouting Limited
148 Bellevue Road