Carmen Trustee Company Limited was started on 12 Mar 2007 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429033542249. The registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Paul John Mccormick - an active director whose contract began on 18 Aug 2014,
Carole Mcgregor Smith - an inactive director whose contract began on 12 Mar 2007 and was terminated on 18 Aug 2014.
According to our data (last updated on 23 Aug 2024), this company uses 1 address: 130 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (category: physical, service).
Up until 07 Sep 2018, Carmen Trustee Company Limited had been using First Floor, 6 Boston Road, Mount Eden, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Mccormick, Paul John (a director) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052.
Previous addresses
Address: First Floor, 6 Boston Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 27 Jan 2016 to 07 Sep 2018
Address: Level 4, 152 Fanshawe Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Sep 2014 to 27 Jan 2016
Address: 19 Seaview Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 07 May 2014 to 16 Sep 2014
Address: 168 Upland Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Jul 2010 to 07 May 2014
Address: 101 Jervois Road, Herne Bay, Auckland 1011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 22 Jul 2009 to 16 Jul 2010
Address: Plaza Level, West Plaza, 1-3 Albert Street, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 12 Mar 2007 to 22 Jul 2009
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 11 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Mccormick, Paul John |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
08 Sep 2014 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Smith, Carole Mcgregor |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
02 Apr 2009 - 08 Sep 2014 |
Individual | Smith, Carole Macgregor |
Plaza Level, West Plaza, 1-3 Albert Street, Auckland |
12 Mar 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Manning, Timothy Terence |
19-21 Como Street Takapuna, Auckland |
02 Apr 2009 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Paul John Mccormick - Director
Appointment date: 18 Aug 2014
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Nov 2015
Carole Mcgregor Smith - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Mar 2007
Termination date: 18 Aug 2014
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Apr 2014
Shinein' Ark Properties Limited
Sme Financial
Society Insight Limited
Sme Financial
Empire Electrical Services (2017) Limited
Ground Floor
Asw Holdings Limited
6 Boston Road
Oneworld Collection (2012) New Zealand Limited
6 Boston Road
Rwr Ip Limited
6 Boston Road