Cragside Farming Limited, a registered company, was launched on 25 Jun 2007. 9429033344430 is the NZ business number it was issued. This company has been managed by 4 directors: Gladys Lorraine Armstrong - an active director whose contract started on 25 Jun 2007,
Janette Mary Armstrong - an active director whose contract started on 25 Jun 2007,
William Mark Armstrong - an active director whose contract started on 25 Jun 2007,
Neville Alexander Armstrong - an active director whose contract started on 25 Jun 2007.
Updated on 22 Jul 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street, Alexandra, 9320 (types include: registered, physical).
Cragside Farming Limited had been using Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street, Alexandra as their registered address up until 31 May 2022.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 12 shareholders (7 groups). The first group is comprised of 490 shares (49 per cent) held by 3 entities. There is also a second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 10 shares (1 per cent). Lastly we have the third share allocation (240 shares 24 per cent) made up of 3 entities.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street, Alexandra, 9320 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 May 2013 to 31 May 2022
Address: C/-ibbotson Cooney Limited, Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street, Alexandra New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 25 Jun 2007 to 20 May 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 21 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 490 | |||
Individual | Armstrong, Neville Alexander |
Rd 2 Oturehua 9387 New Zealand |
25 Jun 2007 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Tarbert Trustees (2016) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042164272 |
69 Tarbert Street Alexandra 9320 New Zealand |
01 Dec 2017 - |
Individual | Armstrong, Janette Mary |
Rd 2 Oturehua 9387 New Zealand |
25 Jun 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Armstrong, Gladys Lorraine |
Rd 2 Oturehua 9387 New Zealand |
25 Jun 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 240 | |||
Individual | Armstrong, Penelope Jane |
Rd 2 Omakau 9377 New Zealand |
26 Sep 2007 - |
Individual | Armstrong, William Mark |
Alexandra Alexandra 9320 New Zealand |
26 Sep 2007 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Tarbert Trustees (2007) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033391007 |
Alexandra 9320 New Zealand |
26 Sep 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 240 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Tarbert Trustees (2007) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033391007 |
Alexandra 9320 New Zealand |
26 Sep 2007 - |
Individual | Armstrong, Gladys Lorraine |
Rd 2 Oturehua 9387 New Zealand |
25 Jun 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Armstrong, William Mark |
Alexandra Alexandra 9320 New Zealand |
25 Jun 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #6 Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Individual | Armstrong, Neville Alexander |
Rd 2 Oturehua 9387 New Zealand |
25 Jun 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #7 Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Individual | Armstrong, Janette Mary |
Rd 2 Oturehua 9387 New Zealand |
25 Jun 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Cooney, William Thomas |
Bridge Hill Alexandra 9320 New Zealand |
25 Jun 2007 - 01 Dec 2017 |
Gladys Lorraine Armstrong - Director
Appointment date: 25 Jun 2007
Address: Rd 2, Oturehua, 9387 New Zealand
Address used since 11 May 2010
Janette Mary Armstrong - Director
Appointment date: 25 Jun 2007
Address: Rd 2, Oturehua, 9387 New Zealand
Address used since 11 May 2010
William Mark Armstrong - Director
Appointment date: 25 Jun 2007
Address: Alexandra, Alexandra, 9320 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Oct 2023
Address: Alexandra, Alexandra, 9320 New Zealand
Address used since 22 May 2015
Neville Alexander Armstrong - Director
Appointment date: 25 Jun 2007
Address: Rd 2, Oturehua, 9387 New Zealand
Address used since 11 May 2010
The Gorge Pastoral Limited
Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street
Cornaig Holdings Limited
Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street
Precision Works (2013) Limited
Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street
Cornaig Farms Limited
Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street
Blackstone Hill Mining Limited
Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street
Tarbert Trustees (2013) Limited
Level 1, 69 Tarbert Street