Fmctv Limited, a registered company, was launched on 05 Sep 2007. 9429033186405 is the NZBN it was issued. The company has been managed by 6 directors: Glenn Robin Tong - an active director whose contract began on 05 Sep 2007,
Andrew Hooker - an active director whose contract began on 01 Nov 2009,
Allan Wilson Mcskimming - an active director whose contract began on 01 Nov 2009,
Michael Walter Daniel - an active director whose contract began on 13 Apr 2011,
Paul Jonathan Kenny - an inactive director whose contract began on 05 Sep 2007 and was terminated on 10 Feb 2011.
Updated on 21 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 4 addresses this company registered, namely: Suite 15, 386 Richmond Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 (physical address),
Suite 15, 386 Richmond Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 (service address),
Suite 15, 386 Richmond Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 (registered address),
Po Box 47209, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1144 (postal address) among others.
Fmctv Limited had been using 33 Ireland St, Freemans Bay, Auckland as their physical address until 29 Apr 2021.
More names for this company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 05 Sep 2007 to 21 May 2008 they were named Fmcg Tv Limited.
A total of 336000 shares are allotted to 7 shareholders (4 groups). The first group is comprised of 112162 shares (33.38 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 3 shareholders in control of 120184 shares (35.77 per cent). Finally there is the next share allocation (36358 shares 10.82 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Other active addresses
Address #4: Suite 15, 386 Richmond Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Physical & service address used from 29 Apr 2021
Principal place of activity
Suite 15, 386 Richmond Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 33 Ireland St, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Physical address used from 15 Dec 2011 to 29 Apr 2021
Address #2: 33 Ireland St, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Registered address used from 15 Dec 2011 to 15 Apr 2021
Address #3: 3/3 Margaret St, Ponsonby, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 21 Oct 2009 to 15 Dec 2011
Address #4: 3 Cox St, Herne Bay
Physical & registered address used from 09 Jul 2008 to 21 Oct 2009
Address #5: 57j Livingstone Street, Westmere, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 05 Sep 2007 to 09 Jul 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 336000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 09 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 112162 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Wairahi Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048293822 |
Langs Beach Waipu 0582 New Zealand |
30 Sep 2020 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 120184 | |||
Individual | Tong, Steven Russell |
Freemans Bay Auckland New Zealand |
05 Sep 2007 - |
Individual | Tong, Glenn Robin |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 New Zealand |
05 Sep 2007 - |
Individual | Fowler, John Walter |
Campbells Bay Auckland New Zealand |
05 Sep 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 36358 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | The Gunny Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033335742 |
Whangarei 0110 New Zealand |
05 Sep 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 67296 | |||
Individual | Mcskimming, Sally Ann |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2010 - |
Individual | Mcskimming, Allan Wilson |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2010 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Burton, Nigel Geoffrey Ledgard |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2010 - 30 Sep 2020 |
Individual | Kenny, Paul Jonathan |
Herne Bay Auckland New Zealand |
05 Sep 2007 - 13 Apr 2011 |
Individual | Daniel, Michael Walter |
Rd 2 Waipu 0582 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2010 - 30 Sep 2020 |
Individual | Benjamin, Michael Murray |
Palm Beach Waiheke Island 1081 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2010 - 30 Sep 2020 |
Individual | Friedlander, Paul Benjamin |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2010 - 14 Nov 2019 |
Entity | Z And M Trust Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033354620 Company Number: 1949575 |
05 Sep 2007 - 28 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | Z And M Trust Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033354620 Company Number: 1949575 |
05 Sep 2007 - 28 Jun 2010 | |
Individual | Murphy, Jennifer Eileen |
Herne Bay Auckland New Zealand |
05 Sep 2007 - 13 Apr 2011 |
Individual | Jones, Lachie Kennedy |
Westmere Auckland 1022 New Zealand |
11 May 2012 - 19 Sep 2013 |
Glenn Robin Tong - Director
Appointment date: 05 Sep 2007
Address: Westmere, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Feb 2017
Address: Westmere, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Apr 2017
Andrew Hooker - Director
Appointment date: 01 Nov 2009
Address: Birkenhead, North Shore City, 0626 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 2009
Address: Papatoetoe, Auckland, 2104 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Apr 2018
Address: Birkenhead, Auckland, 0626 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Apr 2019
Allan Wilson Mcskimming - Director
Appointment date: 01 Nov 2009
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 2009
Michael Walter Daniel - Director
Appointment date: 13 Apr 2011
Address: Rd 2, Waipu, 0582 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Apr 2011
Paul Jonathan Kenny - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Sep 2007
Termination date: 10 Feb 2011
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland, New Zealand
Address used since 05 Sep 2007
Andrew Michael Fonagy - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Sep 2007
Termination date: 21 Dec 2009
Address: Devonport, Auckland, New Zealand
Address used since 05 Sep 2007
Franklin Road Rocks Limited
84-86 Franklin Rd
Bikeko Limited
2/32 Ireland Street
3283 Limited
86 Franklin Road
Weightless Program Limited
72 Franklin Road
Central Station (nz) Limited
35 Ireland Street
Sound Cycle Limited
15 Spring Street