Burnett Consulting Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 08 Feb 2008. 9429032919288 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Business consultant service" (business classification M696205) is how the company was classified. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Frances Stephne Burnett - an active director whose contract began on 08 Feb 2008,
Frances Stephne Burnett Jeffries - an active director whose contract began on 08 Feb 2008.
Last updated on 05 Sep 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 65 Constellation Avenue, Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 (type: service, registered).
Burnett Consulting Limited had been using 10 Patons Road, Howick, Auckland as their registered address until 14 Jan 2013.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 10000 shares) - Burnett, Frances Stephne - located at 2018, Beachlands, Auckland.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 65 Constellation Avenue, Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Service & registered address used from 01 Sep 2023
Principal place of activity
106 Karaka Road, Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 10 Patons Road, Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 14 Aug 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
Address #2: 10 Paton Road, Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 15 Aug 2011 to 14 Aug 2012
Address #3: 10 Paton Road, Howick, 2014 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 08 Feb 2008 to 15 Aug 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 26 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 10000 | |||
Director | Burnett, Frances Stephne |
Beachlands Auckland 2018 New Zealand |
07 Sep 2022 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Burnett Jeffries, Frances Stephne |
Beachlands Auckland 2018 New Zealand |
08 Feb 2008 - 07 Sep 2022 |
Frances Stephne Burnett - Director
Appointment date: 08 Feb 2008
Address: Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Aug 2023
Address: Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Jan 2013
Frances Stephne Burnett Jeffries - Director
Appointment date: 08 Feb 2008
Address: Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Jan 2013
Auckland Electrical & Pump Services Limited
102 Karaka Road
Beachland Properties Limited
102 Karaka Road
Wang Hua Limited
228 Jack Lachlan Drive
Rp Investments 16 Limited
177 Jack Lachlan Drive
Trotter Plumbers Limited
79 Karaka Road
Awal Investments Limited
76 Pine Harbour Parade
4 D Solutions Limited
25 Third View Avenue
Ensuritynz Limited
36 Third View Avenue
Morgsol Consulting Limited
74 Pine Harbour Parade
Njc Limited
45 Third View Avenue
Woodbridge Buys Consulting Limited
18 Fourth View Avenue
Wragg Miller Consulting Services Limited
15 Harbourside Court