Hf Systems Limited was registered on 15 May 2008 and issued an NZBN of 9429032752250. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 1 director, named James Patrick Tucker - an active director whose contract started on 15 May 2008.
According to BizDb's information (last updated on 18 Jul 2024), the company registered 1 address: 65 Edmund Street, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 (type: registered, service).
Until 06 May 2022, Hf Systems Limited had been using 400 Lake Road, Takapuna, Auckland as their registered address.
BizDb identified other names for the company: from 15 May 2008 to 04 Feb 2020 they were called Habitual Fix Systems Nz Limited.
A total of 105263 shares are allocated to 4 groups (4 shareholders in total). In the first group, 10263 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Mad Group Limited (an entity) located at St Heliers, Auckland postcode 1071.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 2.38% shares (exactly 2500 shares) and includes
Mad Group Limited - located at St Heliers, Auckland.
The third share allocation (87237 shares, 82.88%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Mad Group Limited, located at St Heliers, Auckland (an entity).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 400 Lake Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Registered address used from 25 Jun 2020 to 06 May 2022
Address #2: 400 Lake Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Physical address used from 25 Jun 2020 to 09 May 2022
Address #3: Level 1, 108 Ponsonby Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 14 Aug 2017 to 25 Jun 2020
Address #4: Level 5, Westfield Tower, 45 Knights Road, Lower Hutt New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 15 May 2008 to 14 Aug 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 105263
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 30 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 10263 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Mad Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031361392 |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
21 Sep 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 2500 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Mad Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031361392 |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
21 Sep 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 87237 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Mad Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031361392 |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
21 Sep 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 5263 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Mad Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031361392 |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
21 Sep 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Scw Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038193149 Company Number: 835890 |
15 May 2008 - 21 Sep 2012 | |
Individual | Tucker, Nicholas Ronald |
Lower Hutt New Zealand |
15 May 2008 - 21 Sep 2012 |
Individual | Cottier, Yvonne Marie |
R D 7 Masterton New Zealand |
15 May 2008 - 21 Sep 2012 |
Individual | Butler, David Willam |
Lower Hutt New Zealand |
15 May 2008 - 21 Sep 2012 |
Individual | Tucker, James Patrick |
Orakei Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
15 May 2008 - 21 Sep 2012 |
Individual | Cottier, Peter Francis |
R D 7 Masterton New Zealand |
15 May 2008 - 21 Sep 2012 |
Entity | Scw Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038193149 Company Number: 835890 |
15 May 2008 - 21 Sep 2012 | |
Individual | Benest, Timothy William |
South Titirangi Auckland New Zealand |
15 May 2008 - 21 Sep 2012 |
Individual | Lawton, Aaron |
Te Atatu Peninsula Auckland 0610 New Zealand |
04 Jul 2011 - 21 Sep 2012 |
Ultimate Holding Company
James Patrick Tucker - Director
Appointment date: 15 May 2008
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Oct 2023
Address: Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Nov 2018
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2016
Gyw Trustees (rodler/mills) Limited
Level 5
Gyw Trustees (larkin) Limited
Level 5
Gyw Trustees (ross O'brien) Limited
Level 5
Gyw Trustees (ray Watkins) Limited
Level 5
Gyw Trustees (haste) Limited
Level 5
Gyw Trustees (gaskell) Limited
Level 5