Auckland Weight Loss Surgery Limited, a registered company, was registered on 11 Jul 2008. 9429032702781 is the business number it was issued. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Richard Babor - an active director whose contract began on 11 Jul 2008,
Grant Rocco Beban - an active director whose contract began on 11 Jul 2008.
Last updated on 26 Jul 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 12 Florence Avenue, Orewa, 0931 (type: registered, physical).
Auckland Weight Loss Surgery Limited had been using 12 Florence Avenue, Orewa as their registered address until 12 Mar 2012.
A total of 120 shares are allotted to 7 shareholders (5 groups). The first group consists of 58 shares (48.33%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 2 shares (1.67%). Lastly there is the next share allotment (1 share 0.83%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 12 Florence Avenue, Orewa, 0931 New Zealand
Registered address used from 15 Apr 2011 to 12 Mar 2012
Address #2: C/-baldry + Sanford Ltd, 76 Forge Road, Silverdale New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Jul 2008 to 15 Apr 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 120
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 20 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 58 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Babor Trust Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047934795 |
Hillary Square, Orewa Auckland 0931 New Zealand |
16 Jun 2020 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 2 | |||
Individual | Babor, Richard |
Point Chevalier Auckland 1022 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2008 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Beban, Grant Rocco |
Epsom Auckland New Zealand |
11 Jul 2008 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Putterill, Megan Jane |
Epsom Auckland New Zealand |
11 Jul 2008 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 58 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Business Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039429575 |
Orewa 0931 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2008 - |
Individual | Putterill, Megan Jane |
Epsom Auckland New Zealand |
11 Jul 2008 - |
Individual | Beban, Grant Rocco |
Epsom Auckland New Zealand |
11 Jul 2008 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Tooley, Maxine |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2008 - 16 Jun 2020 |
Individual | Tooley, Maxine |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2008 - 16 Jun 2020 |
Individual | Tooley, Maxine |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2008 - 16 Jun 2020 |
Richard Babor - Director
Appointment date: 11 Jul 2008
Address: Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Mar 2019
Address: Mt Albert, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Mar 2016
Grant Rocco Beban - Director
Appointment date: 11 Jul 2008
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Mar 2016
Tekmed Nz Pty Limited
12 Florence Avenue
Scr Limited
12 Florence Avenue
Allens Trustees (2009) Limited
12 Florence Avenue
Windress Home Appliance Services Limited
12 Florence Avenue
Cranefield Automotive And Tyres Limited
12 Florence Avenue
Gridspy Limited
12 Florence Avenue