Sw Trust Services (Nine) Limited, a registered company, was started on 20 Jan 2009. 9429032421644 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 8 directors: Brian Maxwell Stewart - an active director whose contract started on 20 Jan 2009,
Gregory Paul Woodd - an active director whose contract started on 20 Jan 2009,
Robert Alan Clark - an active director whose contract started on 20 Jan 2009,
Gary Graeme Simpson - an active director whose contract started on 20 Jan 2009,
Kenneth James Paterson - an active director whose contract started on 02 May 2011.
Updated on 11 Feb 2021, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 3, Takapuna Finance Centre, 159 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 (types include: registered, physical).
Sw Trust Services (Nine) Limited had been using Level 17, Aia Building, 5-7 Byron Ave, Takapuna, North Shore as their physical address until 26 Jul 2017.
A total of 120 shares are issued to 4 shareholders (4 groups). The first group is comprised of 24 shares (20%) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 24 shares (20%). Finally the 3rd share allocation (48 shares 40%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous address
Address: Level 17, Aia Building, 5-7 Byron Ave, Takapuna, North Shore New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 20 Jan 2009 to 26 Jul 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 120
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 11 Feb 2020
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 24 | |||
Individual | Robert Alan Clark |
Mt Eden Auckland New Zealand |
20 Jan 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 24 | |||
Individual | Brian Maxwell Stewart |
Devonport North Shore New Zealand |
20 Jan 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 48 | |||
Individual | Gregory Paul Woodd |
Matakatia Bay Whangaparaoa New Zealand |
20 Jan 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 24 | |||
Individual | Gary Graeme Simpson |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
20 Jan 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Christopher Desmond Western |
Mairangi Bay North Shore New Zealand |
20 Jan 2009 - 27 Feb 2017 |
Brian Maxwell Stewart - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2009
Address: Devonport, North Shore, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jan 2009
Gregory Paul Woodd - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2009
Address: Matakatia, Whangaparaoa, 0930 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Feb 2010
Robert Alan Clark - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2009
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Feb 2010
Gary Graeme Simpson - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2009
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Nov 2020
Address: Campbells Bay, North Shore, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jan 2009
Kenneth James Paterson - Director
Appointment date: 02 May 2011
Address: Milford, North Shore City, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 02 May 2011
Sarah Martin - Director
Appointment date: 17 Oct 2013
Address: Matakana, 0985 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Oct 2013
Nicola Jane Russ - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Dec 2014
Termination date: 21 Aug 2019
Address: Beach Haven, Auckland, 0626 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Dec 2014
Address: Beach Haven, Auckland, 0626 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Aug 2017
Christopher Desmond Western - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2009
Termination date: 16 Feb 2017
Address: Mairangi Bay, North Shore, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jan 2009
Crawfords Souvenirs Limited
Level 1, 507 Lake Road
Fit Futures Learning Institute Limited
Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street
Portland Holdings Trustee Limited
Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street
Sayles Corporate Trustee Limited
Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street
Signcraftsmen Hamilton Limited
Level 1, 6 Como Street
Shipco Transport Limited
Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street