Eko Merino Limited was registered on 07 Apr 2009 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429032359824. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 6 directors: Andrew William Simpson - an active director whose contract started on 07 Apr 2009,
Martin James Dollar Pattie - an active director whose contract started on 07 Apr 2009,
Allan Steward Pitts - an active director whose contract started on 25 Nov 2010,
Donna-Framina Lambert - an inactive director whose contract started on 07 Apr 2009 and was terminated on 08 Sep 2010,
Geoffrey Mathew Lambert - an inactive director whose contract started on 07 Apr 2009 and was terminated on 08 Sep 2010.
As stated in BizDb's data (updated on 08 Aug 2024), this company filed 1 address: 58 Arthur Street, Blenheim, 7201 (category: registered, service).
Until 21 Jan 2022, Eko Merino Limited had been using 65 Seymour Street, Blenheim as their physical address.
A total of 1500 shares are issued to 3 groups (4 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 500 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Pittsons Limited (an entity) located at Blenheim postcode 7201.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 33.33% shares (exactly 500 shares) and includes
Pattie Company Limited - located at Burnside, Christchurch.
The 3rd share allotment (500 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Simpson, Karen Frances, located at Lake Tekapo (an individual),
Simpson, Andrew William, located at Lake Tekapo (an individual).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 65 Seymour Street, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 01 Mar 2011 to 21 Jan 2022
Address #2: 20 Oxford Street, Richmond, Nelson New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 30 Jul 2010 to 01 Mar 2011
Address #3: Duncan Cotterill, 197 Bridge Street, Nelson 7010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 07 Apr 2009 to 30 Jul 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1500
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 21 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Pittsons Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032363661 |
Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
07 Apr 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Pattie Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037275051 |
Burnside Christchurch 8053 New Zealand |
07 Apr 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Simpson, Karen Frances |
Lake Tekapo New Zealand |
07 Apr 2009 - |
Individual | Simpson, Andrew William |
Lake Tekapo |
07 Apr 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Lambert, Geoffrey Mathew |
Nelson |
07 Apr 2009 - 21 Jan 2011 |
Individual | Lambert, Donna-framina |
Nelson |
07 Apr 2009 - 21 Jan 2011 |
Andrew William Simpson - Director
Appointment date: 07 Apr 2009
Address: Lake Tekapo, 7945 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Mar 2016
Martin James Dollar Pattie - Director
Appointment date: 07 Apr 2009
Address: Rd 1, Seddon, 7285 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Apr 2010
Allan Steward Pitts - Director
Appointment date: 25 Nov 2010
Address: 5473 Awatere Valley Road, Marlborough, 7240 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Mar 2016
Donna-framina Lambert - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Apr 2009
Termination date: 08 Sep 2010
Address: Nelson,
Address used since 07 Apr 2009
Geoffrey Mathew Lambert - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Apr 2009
Termination date: 08 Sep 2010
Address: Nelson,
Address used since 07 Apr 2009
Nicholas Harold Gerritsen - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Apr 2009
Termination date: 21 May 2010
Address: 130 Waikawa Road, Picton,
Address used since 07 Apr 2009
Port Underwood Contracting Services Limited
65 Seymour Street
Pjs Investments 2013 Limited
65 Seymour Street
Hall Family Farms Limited
65 Seymour Street
Berakah Vineyard Management Limited
65 Seymour Street
Lower Waihopai Dam Limited
65 Seymour Street
Rossmore Limited
65 Seymour Street