Gerson Properties Limited was incorporated on 22 Jun 2009 and issued an NZBN of 9429032215991. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Floyd Richard Gerson - an active director whose contract began on 22 Jun 2009,
Maria Johanna Gerson-De Wolf - an active director whose contract began on 22 Jun 2009.
According to our information (last updated on 04 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 232 St Heliers Bay Road, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 (category: registered, physical).
Until 14 Aug 2015, Gerson Properties Limited had been using 106 Cascades Road, Pakuranga Heights, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 99 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Gerson, Floyd Richard (an individual) located at St Heliers, Auckland postcode 1071.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 1 per cent shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Gerson-De Wolf, Maria Johanna - located at St Heliers, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address: 106 Cascades Road, Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 24 Jul 2012 to 14 Aug 2015
Address: 33 Awa Street, Otahuhu, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 22 Jun 2009 to 24 Jul 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 12 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Individual | Gerson, Floyd Richard |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
22 Jun 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Gerson-de Wolf, Maria Johanna |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
22 Jun 2009 - |
Floyd Richard Gerson - Director
Appointment date: 22 Jun 2009
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Aug 2015
Maria Johanna Gerson-de Wolf - Director
Appointment date: 22 Jun 2009
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Aug 2015
Kains & Co. Petro Limited
221 St Heliers Bay Road
Kains Actax & Associates Limited
221 St Heliers Bay
Breeze Furniture Limited
11 Ashby Avenue
Mills Surgical Group Limited
St Heliers
Basrur Consulting Limited
218a St Heliers Bay Road
Birch Haberdashery & Craft Limited
St Heliers