Norann Trust Limited was launched on 04 Aug 2009 and issued a business number of 9429032079623. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Jocelyn Anne Marston - an active director whose contract began on 04 Aug 2009,
Jeffrey Norman Hansen - an inactive director whose contract began on 04 Aug 2009 and was terminated on 22 Aug 2022.
As stated in BizDb's information (last updated on 04 Aug 2024), this company uses 2 addresses: 1088 Victoria Street, Whitiora, Hamilton, 3200 (physical address),
1088 Victoria Street, Whitiora, Hamilton, 3200 (service address),
95A Harrowfield Drive, Harrowfield, Hamilton, 3210 (registered address).
Until 23 Sep 2021, Norann Trust Limited had been using C/-Sd Legal Limited, 1088 Victoria Street, Hamilton as their physical address.
A total of 120 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 120 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Marston, Jocelyn Anne (an individual) located at Harrowfield, Hamilton postcode 3210.
Previous addresses
Address #1: C/-sd Legal Limited, 1088 Victoria Street, Hamilton, 3200 New Zealand
Physical address used from 09 Aug 2016 to 23 Sep 2021
Address #2: C/-sd Legal Limited, Level 1, 18 Rostrevor Street, Hamilton, 3204 New Zealand
Physical address used from 24 Aug 2015 to 09 Aug 2016
Address #3: C/-sd Legal Limited, 18 Rostrevor Street, Hamilton, 3204 New Zealand
Physical address used from 14 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2015
Address #4: C/-fletcher Law Limited, 20 Rostrevor Street, Hamilton, 3204 New Zealand
Physical address used from 12 Jul 2012 to 14 Jul 2014
Address #5: C/-fletcher Law, 20 Rostrevor Street, Hamilton New Zealand
Physical address used from 04 Aug 2009 to 12 Jul 2012
Address #6: 95a Harrowfield Drive, Hamilton New Zealand
Registered address used from 04 Aug 2009 to 12 Jul 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 120
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 02 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 120 | |||
Individual | Marston, Jocelyn Anne |
Harrowfield Hamilton 3210 New Zealand |
04 Aug 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Hansen, Jeffrey Norman |
Harrowfield Hamilton 3210 New Zealand |
04 Aug 2009 - 09 Apr 2024 |
Jocelyn Anne Marston - Director
Appointment date: 04 Aug 2009
Address: Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Aug 2015
Jeffrey Norman Hansen - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Aug 2009
Termination date: 22 Aug 2022
Address: Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Aug 2015
Sd Legal Trustees Limited
1088 Victoria Street
Sd Legal Limited
1088 Victoria Street
Spencer Moore Trust Limited
1088 Victoria Street
Alexander Campbell Trust Limited
1088 Victoria Street
Zurich Investments Limited
1088 Victoria Street
Isaben Limited
1088 Victoria Street