Burmont Limited, a registered company, was registered on 08 Oct 2009. 9429031881654 is the business number it was issued. "Building, residential - renting or leasing - other than holiday" (business classification L671120) is how the company has been classified. The company has been managed by 1 director, named Shane Francis Dennison - an active director whose contract began on 08 Oct 2009.
Last updated on 03 Sep 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 19 Fourth View Ave, Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 (types include: physical, registered).
Burmont Limited had been using 16 Buckland Road, Mangere East, Auckland as their physical address up until 12 Feb 2016.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Dennison, Shane Francis - located at 2018, Beachlands, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address: 16 Buckland Road, Mangere East, Auckland, 2024 New Zealand
Physical address used from 10 Feb 2015 to 12 Feb 2016
Address: 16 Buckland Road, Mangere East, Auckland, 2024 New Zealand
Physical address used from 13 Mar 2014 to 10 Feb 2015
Address: 16 Buckland Road, Mangere East, Auckland, 2024 New Zealand
Registered address used from 12 Mar 2014 to 12 Feb 2016
Address: Level 6, 135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Registered address used from 12 Feb 2013 to 12 Mar 2014
Address: Level 6, 135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical address used from 12 Feb 2013 to 13 Mar 2014
Address: C/-gilligan Rowe & Associates Limited, Level 6/ 135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland 1149 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 08 Oct 2009 to 12 Feb 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 02 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Dennison, Shane Francis |
Beachlands Auckland 2018 New Zealand |
08 Oct 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Cornwall Trustees Os Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031908573 Company Number: 2324471 |
08 Oct 2009 - 04 Mar 2014 | |
Entity | Cornwall Trustees Os Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031908573 Company Number: 2324471 |
08 Oct 2009 - 04 Mar 2014 |
Shane Francis Dennison - Director
Appointment date: 08 Oct 2009
Address: Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Feb 2016
Property Ez Limited
19 Fourth View Ave
Beachlands Community Trust
16 Wakelin Road
G J Mead Investments Limited
9 Fourth View Avenue
O'malley Family Trustee Limited
33 Third View Avenue
Volt Works Electrical Limited
33 Third View Avenue
Njc Limited
45 Third View Avenue
Countrymans Enterprise Limited
82 John Gill Road
Nazpac Limited
118 Pah Road
Oudney Investments Limited
62 Eighth View Avenue
Quality Residential Investments Limited
212 Sandspit Road
Scarlet Property Investments Limited
105 Litten Road
Windfall Properties Limited
21 Craig Road