Waikaretu Wall Limited was launched on 12 Jan 2010 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031750127. This registered LTD company has been managed by 4 directors: Michol Janene Fisher - an active director whose contract began on 12 Jan 2010,
Richard Craig Kuegler - an active director whose contract began on 12 Jan 2010,
Joanne Colleen Kuegler - an active director whose contract began on 12 Jan 2010,
Noel Anthony Lynch - an active director whose contract began on 12 Jan 2010.
As stated in BizDb's data (updated on 26 Jul 2024), the company filed 1 address: 39 Streamfields Way, Bombay, 2472 (type: registered, physical).
Until 18 May 2018, Waikaretu Wall Limited had been using 251 Beaver Road, Rd 2, Pokeno as their physical address.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 2 groups (6 shareholders in total). In the first group, 250 shares are held by 3 entities, namely:
Fisher, Michol Janene (an individual) located at Freemans Bay, Auckland postcode 1011,
Lynch, Noel Anthony (an individual) located at Freemans Bay, Auckland postcode 1011,
Jespersen, Ian Andrew (an individual) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010.
The 2nd group consists of 3 shareholders, holds 50% shares (exactly 500 shares) and includes
Kuegler, Richard Craig - located at Bombay,
Lynch, Noel Anthony - located at Freemans Bay, Auckland,
Kuegler, Joanne Colleen - located at Bombay.
Previous addresses
Address: 251 Beaver Road, Rd 2, Pokeno, 2472 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 29 Mar 2011 to 18 May 2018
Address: 164 Manukau Road, Pukekohe New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Jan 2010 to 29 Mar 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 05 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 250 | |||
Individual | Fisher, Michol Janene |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
12 Jan 2010 - |
Individual | Lynch, Noel Anthony |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
12 Jan 2010 - |
Individual | Jespersen, Ian Andrew |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
12 Jan 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Kuegler, Richard Craig |
Bombay 2472 New Zealand |
12 Jan 2010 - |
Individual | Lynch, Noel Anthony |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
12 Jan 2010 - |
Individual | Kuegler, Joanne Colleen |
Bombay 2472 New Zealand |
12 Jan 2010 - |
Michol Janene Fisher - Director
Appointment date: 12 Jan 2010
Address: Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Mar 2016
Richard Craig Kuegler - Director
Appointment date: 12 Jan 2010
Address: Bombay, 2472 New Zealand
Address used since 10 May 2018
Address: Rd 2, Pokeno, 2472 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Mar 2011
Joanne Colleen Kuegler - Director
Appointment date: 12 Jan 2010
Address: Bombay, 2472 New Zealand
Address used since 10 May 2018
Address: Rd 2, Pokeno, 2472 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Mar 2011
Noel Anthony Lynch - Director
Appointment date: 12 Jan 2010
Address: Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Mar 2016
Blundell Concrete Products Limited
39 Streamfields Way
Andrew Brown Builders Limited
39 Streamfields Way
Streamfield Investments Limited
39 Streamfields Way
H2 Holdings Limited
39 Streamfields Way
Silver Fern Racing Limited
39 Streamfields Way
Itb Services Limited
39 Streamfields Way