Simply Pharmacy Limited was registered on 21 Jan 2010 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031698795. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Catherine Armes - an active director whose contract began on 21 Jan 2010,
Jeremy Robert Armes - an inactive director whose contract began on 02 Feb 2010 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2010,
Blair Craig Johnson - an inactive director whose contract began on 21 Jan 2010 and was terminated on 31 Jan 2010.
As stated in our data (updated on 15 Aug 2024), the company uses 2 addresses: 28 Masons Avenue, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 (physical address),
28 Masons Ave, Herne Bay, Auckland (other address),
28 Masons Avenue, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 (registered address),
28 Masons Avenue, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 (service address) among others.
A total of 1200 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 612 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Armes, Catherine (an individual) located at Browns Bay, Auckland postcode 0630.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 49% shares (exactly 588 shares) and includes
Simply Pharmacy Holdings Limited - located at Herne Bay, Auckland. Simply Pharmacy Limited has been classified as "Chemist shop operation - pharmacy" (ANZSIC G427110).
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1200
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 29 Nov 2021
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 612 | |||
Individual | Armes, Catherine |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
21 Jan 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 588 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Simply Pharmacy Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031698894 |
Herne Bay Auckland |
21 Jan 2010 - |
Ultimate Holding Company
Catherine Armes - Director
Appointment date: 21 Jan 2010
Address: Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Feb 2013
Jeremy Robert Armes - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Feb 2010
Termination date: 31 Mar 2010
Address: Rothesay Bay, North Shore City,
Address used since 02 Feb 2010
Blair Craig Johnson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Jan 2010
Termination date: 31 Jan 2010
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland, New Zealand
Address used since 21 Jan 2010
Mcintosh Fletcher Civil (nz) Limited
28 Masons Avenue
Field Drainage Specialists (nz) Limited
28 Masons Avenue
Triomphe Limited
28 Masons Avenue
Haba Holdings Limited
28 Masons Avenue
Baxterhr Limited
24 Masons Avenue
Slice Of Uptown Limited
24 Masons Avenue
A & E Chemist Limited
Grant Thornton Auckland Limited
Chb Apothecary Limited
C/-pkf Ross Melville
Flagstaff Pharmacy Limited
Level 10
Grey Lynn Amcal Pharmacy Limited
2 Tuarangi Road
Northcare Community Pharmacy Limited
Level 10, 203 Queen Street
Three Lamps Pharmacy Limited
1/283 Ponsonby Road