Pg Canada Limited, a registered company, was launched on 02 Jun 2010. 9429031542906 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. This company has been supervised by 6 directors: John Summerhays - an active director whose contract began on 02 Jun 2010,
Kevin Summerhays - an active director whose contract began on 26 May 2020,
John Brian Taylor - an active director whose contract began on 26 May 2020,
Esther Maria Summerhays - an inactive director whose contract began on 26 Feb 2015 and was terminated on 13 May 2020,
Paul Clive Ian Jeffrey - an inactive director whose contract began on 02 Jun 2010 and was terminated on 26 Feb 2015.
Updated on 26 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 10 Dublin Street, Whanganui, Whanganui, 4500 (types include: registered, service).
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 50000 shares) - Pro-Nat Group N Z Limited - located at 4500, Whanganui, Whanganui.
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 50000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 10 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 50000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Pro-nat Group N Z Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032357004 |
Whanganui Whanganui 4500 New Zealand |
12 Jul 2021 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Wallis, Peter |
Westmere Wanganui 4574 New Zealand |
28 Jul 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Director | Summerhays, John |
Lynmouth New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
30 Mar 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Wallis, Yvonne Mary |
Westmere Wanganui 4574 New Zealand |
28 Jul 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Wallis, Yvonne Mary |
Westmere Wanganui 4574 New Zealand |
28 Jul 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Fearn, William John |
College Estate Wanganui 4500 New Zealand |
03 Jun 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Ponga, Steven |
Brooklands New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
09 Apr 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Wallis, Peter |
Westmere Wanganui 4574 New Zealand |
28 Jul 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Smith, Peter Grant |
Pinehill Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
09 Apr 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Entity | Peach Cornwall Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037696351 Company Number: 939027 |
Whanganui Whanganui 4500 New Zealand |
28 Jul 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Summerhays, Kevin |
Tawa Wellington 5028 New Zealand |
09 Apr 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Summerhays, Kevin |
Tawa Wellington 5028 New Zealand |
09 Apr 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Summerhays, Kevin |
Tawa Wellington 5028 New Zealand |
09 Apr 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Taylor, Kerry Marie |
Springvale Wanganui 4501 New Zealand |
03 Jun 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Ponga, Kathryn |
Brooklands New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
09 Apr 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Smith, Karyn Louise |
Pinehill Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
09 Apr 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Director | Summerhays, John |
Lynmouth New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
30 Mar 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Director | Summerhays, John |
Rd 4 Wanganui 4574 New Zealand |
30 Mar 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Director | Summerhays, John |
Lynmouth New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
30 Mar 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Taylor, John Brian |
Springvale Wanganui 4501 New Zealand |
03 Jun 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Entity | Jaam Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049899078 Company Number: 8238977 |
Rd 4 Whanganui 4574 New Zealand |
12 Oct 2021 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Summerhays, Esther Maria |
Tawa Wellington 5028 New Zealand |
09 Apr 2015 - 09 May 2024 |
Individual | Summerhays, Anne |
Whanganui Whanganui 4500 New Zealand |
08 Apr 2015 - 25 Jun 2019 |
Individual | Harris, Madonna Mary |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 New Zealand |
02 Jun 2010 - 30 Mar 2015 |
Individual | Summerhays, John |
Rd 4 Wanganui 4574 New Zealand |
08 Apr 2015 - 09 Apr 2015 |
Entity | Sumfis Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032335675 Company Number: 2222465 |
02 Jun 2010 - 08 Apr 2015 | |
Individual | Milham, Colin |
Saint Johns Hill Wanganui 4500 New Zealand |
08 Apr 2015 - 25 Jun 2019 |
Entity | Sumfis Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032335675 Company Number: 2222465 |
02 Jun 2010 - 08 Apr 2015 | |
Individual | Jeffrey, Paul Clive Ian |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 New Zealand |
02 Jun 2010 - 30 Mar 2015 |
John Summerhays - Director
Appointment date: 02 Jun 2010
Address: Lynmouth, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Feb 2020
Address: Rd 4, Wanganui, 4574 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Apr 2011
Address: Whanganui, Whanganui, 4500 New Zealand
Address used since 10 May 2019
Kevin Summerhays - Director
Appointment date: 26 May 2020
Address: Tawa, Wellington, 5028 New Zealand
Address used since 26 May 2020
John Brian Taylor - Director
Appointment date: 26 May 2020
Address: Springvale, Whanganui, 4501 New Zealand
Address used since 26 May 2020
Esther Maria Summerhays - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Feb 2015
Termination date: 13 May 2020
Address: Tawa, Wellington, 5028 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Feb 2015
Address: Kelburn, Wellington, 6012 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Feb 2015
Paul Clive Ian Jeffrey - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Jun 2010
Termination date: 26 Feb 2015
Address: Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Mar 2014
Madonna Mary Harris - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Jun 2010
Termination date: 26 Feb 2015
Address: Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Mar 2014
Lochrin Holdings Limited
16 Bell Street
Bains Limited
16 Bell Street
Orlowski Kuhn Investments Limited
16 Bell Street
Guilford Consultancy Limited
16 Bell Street
Us N Them Limited
16 Bell Street
Physiotherapy Hand Clinic (wanganui) Limited
16 Bell Street