Lg Force Limited was registered on 23 Jun 2010 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031483032. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Lin Fung Goh - an active director whose contract began on 23 Jun 2010,
Kok Ming Lau - an active director whose contract began on 23 Jun 2010.
According to BizDb's data (last updated on 27 Nov 2021), the company filed 1 address: 122 Harris Drive, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 (category: registered, physical).
Up until 04 Apr 2017, Lg Force Limited had been using 11 Ellice Road, Totara Vale, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Lin Goh (an individual) located at Silverdale, Silverdale postcode 0932.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Kok Lau - located at Silverdale, Silverdale. Lg Force Limited is categorised as "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150).
Principal place of activity
122 Harris Drive, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 11 Ellice Road, Totara Vale, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 22 Jun 2011 to 04 Apr 2017
Address: 1 Ngatoa Place, Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 09 Jun 2011 to 22 Jun 2011
Address: 11 Ellice Road, Totara Vale, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 08 Jun 2011 to 09 Jun 2011
Address: 1 Ngatoa Place, Glenfield, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 23 Jun 2010 to 08 Jun 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 06 Apr 2021
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Lin Fung Goh |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 New Zealand |
23 Jun 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Kok Ming Lau |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 New Zealand |
23 Jun 2010 - |
Lin Fung Goh - Director
Appointment date: 23 Jun 2010
Address: Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Mar 2017
Kok Ming Lau - Director
Appointment date: 23 Jun 2010
Address: Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Mar 2017
Rams Logistics Limited
118 Harris Drive
Wakl Limited
122 Harris Drive
Icecorp Technologies Limited
92 Harris Drive
Alfa Group New Zealand Limited
24 Harris Drive
Pixel Box Production Limited
51
Alfa Medics New Zealand Limited
24 Harris Drive
Chinz Aa Limited
219 Wainui Road
Groom And Gallop Limited
6 Blackwood Road
Hay Homes Limited
47 Manuel Road
Jvh Limited
17 Madison Terrace
Ping An Holdings Limited
34 Butler Stoney Crescent
Star River Homes Limited
30 Madison Terrace