Currie Contracting Limited was incorporated on 13 Dec 2010 and issued an NZBN of 9429031282291. The registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Norman Allan Currie - an active director whose contract started on 13 Dec 2010,
Hilary Currie - an active director whose contract started on 13 Dec 2010.
According to our information (last updated on 20 Jul 2024), this company uses 1 address: 81 Selwyn Avenue, Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071 (types include: physical, registered).
Up until 10 Jul 2019, Currie Contracting Limited had been using 139 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Currie, Hilary (a director) located at Rd 4, Pukekohe postcode 2679.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Currie, Norman Allan - located at Rd 4, Pukekohe. Currie Contracting Limited is categorised as "Business consultant service" (business classification M696205).
Previous addresses
Address: 139 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 02 Dec 2015 to 10 Jul 2019
Address: Level 3, 27 Bath Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 Nov 2015 to 02 Dec 2015
Address: 139 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Jul 2012 to 20 Nov 2015
Address: 94b Percy Millen Drive, Rd 4, Pukekohe, 2679 New Zealand
Physical address used from 13 Dec 2010 to 12 Jul 2012
Address: 182 Great South Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Registered address used from 13 Dec 2010 to 12 Jul 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 01 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Currie, Hilary |
Rd 4 Pukekohe 2679 New Zealand |
13 Dec 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Currie, Norman Allan |
Rd 4 Pukekohe 2679 New Zealand |
13 Dec 2010 - |
Norman Allan Currie - Director
Appointment date: 13 Dec 2010
Address: Rd 4, Pukekohe, 2679 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Dec 2010
Hilary Currie - Director
Appointment date: 13 Dec 2010
Address: Rd 4, Pukekohe, 2679 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Dec 2010
Stone Strong Australia Pty Limited
139 Great South Road
Modern Law Trustee Services Limited
139 Great South Road
C.i.p (nz) Limited
139 Great South Road
The Duck Pond Limited
139 Great South Road
Ofek Technologies Limited
139 Great South Road
Yu & Zhou Investments Limited
139 Great South Road
Akl Business Limited
145a Great South Road
Atb Communications Limited
139 Great South Road
Axiom Economics Limited
139 Great South Road
Business Consultancy Group Nz Limited
139 Great South Road
Dhbw Limited
139 Great South Road
Structured Consulting Limited
139 Great South Road