Newington Properties Limited was registered on 01 Mar 2011 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031199643. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 1 director, named Jason Paul La Hood - an active director whose contract began on 01 Mar 2011.
According to BizDb's data (last updated on 28 Jul 2024), this company registered 1 address: 1St Floor, Asb House, 248 Cumberland Street, Dunedin, 9016 (category: registered, physical).
Up to 16 Mar 2016, Newington Properties Limited had been using 1St Floor, Radio Otago House, 248 Cumberland Street, Dunedin as their physical address.
BizDb found old names for this company: from 01 Mar 2011 to 06 Mar 2020 they were called Kepler Tramping Group Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (5 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
La Hood, Mark David (an individual) located at Maori Hill, Dunedin postcode 9010,
La Hood, Jason Paul (an individual) located at Maori Hill, Dunedin postcode 9010.
Another group consists of 3 shareholders, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
La Hood, Mark David - located at Maori Hill, Dunedin,
La Hood, Jason Paul - located at Maori Hill, Dunedin,
La Hood, Sherrie Dawn - located at Maori Hill, Dunedin.
Previous addresses
Address: 1st Floor, Radio Otago House, 248 Cumberland Street, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 26 Mar 2013 to 16 Mar 2016
Address: C/o Van Aart Sycamore, 1st Floor, Radio Otago House, 248 Cumberland St, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 01 Mar 2011 to 26 Mar 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 11 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | La Hood, Mark David |
Maori Hill Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
07 Mar 2022 - |
Individual | La Hood, Jason Paul |
Maori Hill Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
01 Mar 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | La Hood, Mark David |
Maori Hill Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
07 Mar 2022 - |
Individual | La Hood, Jason Paul |
Maori Hill Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
01 Mar 2011 - |
Individual | La Hood, Sherrie Dawn |
Maori Hill Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
07 Mar 2022 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | La Hood, Mark David |
Maori Hill Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
26 Mar 2021 - 31 May 2021 |
Individual | La Hood, Mark David |
Maori Hill Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
26 Mar 2021 - 31 May 2021 |
Individual | La Hood, Sherrie Dawn |
Maori Hill Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
26 Mar 2021 - 31 May 2021 |
Jason Paul La Hood - Director
Appointment date: 01 Mar 2011
Address: Maori Hill, Dunedin, 9010 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Mar 2018
Address: Musselburgh, Dunedin, 9013 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2011
Shelf 167 Limited
6th Floor, Asb Buiding.
Queens Gardens Properties Limited
8th Floor, Asb House
Karitane Properties Limited
Suite 8, Asb House
Brundell Investments Limited
1st Floor, Asb House
William St Investments Limited
C/o Jason La Hood Solicitor