Jrs Enterprises (2012) Limited was registered on 25 May 2011 and issued a number of 9429031083225. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Claudette Hagenson - an active director whose contract began on 18 Apr 2012,
Geoff Hagenson - an active director whose contract began on 18 Apr 2012,
Annette Giles - an inactive director whose contract began on 25 May 2011 and was terminated on 26 Apr 2012.
According to BizDb's database (last updated on 12 Sep 2024), this company uses 1 address: 135A Reid Road, Rd 1, Waiuku, 2681 (types include: physical, registered).
Until 27 Nov 2020, Jrs Enterprises (2012) Limited had been using 135A Reid Road, Rd 1, Waiuku as their physical address.
BizDb identified previous aliases for this company: from 29 Sep 2011 to 18 Apr 2012 they were named G & L Prof 2 Limited, from 24 May 2011 to 29 Sep 2011 they were named Ag Home Trustee 20 Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Hagenson, Claudette (an individual) located at Rd 1, Waiuku postcode 2681.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Hagenson, Geoff - located at Rd 1, Waiuku. Jrs Enterprises (2012) Limited has been classified as "Investment company operation" (business classification K624050).
Principal place of activity
135a Reid Road, Rd1, Glenbrook, Waiuku, 2681 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 135a Reid Road, Rd 1, Waiuku, 2681 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 13 Nov 2013 to 27 Nov 2020
Address #2: 16 Ryan Place, Manukau, Auckland, 2104 New Zealand
Registered address used from 27 Apr 2012 to 13 Nov 2013
Address #3: 135a Reid Road, Rd 1, Waiuku, 2681 New Zealand
Physical address used from 27 Apr 2012 to 13 Nov 2013
Address #4: 16 Ryan Place, Manukau, Auckland, 2104 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 13 Oct 2011 to 27 Apr 2012
Address #5: 34 Rosemont Road, Waihi, Waihi, 3610 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 25 May 2011 to 13 Oct 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 01 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Hagenson, Claudette |
Rd 1 Waiuku 2681 New Zealand |
18 Apr 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Hagenson, Geoff |
Rd 1 Waiuku 2681 New Zealand |
18 Apr 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Giles, Annette |
Waihi Waihi 3610 New Zealand |
25 May 2011 - 18 Apr 2012 |
Director | Annette Giles |
Waihi Waihi 3610 New Zealand |
25 May 2011 - 18 Apr 2012 |
Claudette Hagenson - Director
Appointment date: 18 Apr 2012
Address: Rd 1, Waiuku, 2681 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Apr 2012
Geoff Hagenson - Director
Appointment date: 18 Apr 2012
Address: Rd 1, Waiuku, 2681 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Apr 2012
Annette Giles - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 May 2011
Termination date: 26 Apr 2012
Address: Waihi, Waihi, 3610 New Zealand
Address used since 25 May 2011
Grace Chinese Mission Church Incorporated
19 Gilmore Road
Atlas Property Holdings Limited
19 Smalley Road
Origio Australasia Pty Ltd
61 Reid Road
Flexicare Australia Pty Ltd
61 Reid Road
Cgs Investments Limited
38 Pakington Lane
Sewtech Innovation Limited
25 Pakington Lane
Alto Capital Investments 4 Limited
169a Percy Millen Drive
Bbca Holdings Limited
166 Heights Road
Hekemai Limited
74 Misa Road
Neuvant Holdings Limited
61 Edinburgh Street
Tahoe Trustee Services Limited
20 Cloverlea Place
Zatch Holdings Limited
61 Edinburgh Street