Aes2020 Limited, a registered company, was launched on 11 Jul 2011. 9429031034074 is the business number it was issued. "Electrical services" (business classification E323220) is how the company was classified. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Ross Lane Taylor - an active director whose contract began on 11 Jul 2011,
Bruce John Fullam - an inactive director whose contract began on 11 Jul 2011 and was terminated on 01 Sep 2017.
Last updated on 23 Jul 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: Takapuna Finance Centre, Level 3, 159 Hurstmere Road Takapuna, Auckland, 0740 (category: physical, service).
Aes2020 Limited had been using Aia Building, Level 17, 5-7 Byron Ave, Takapuna, Auckland as their registered address up until 09 Mar 2020.
Previous aliases for this company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Jan 2020 they were named Adsel Electrical Systems Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 11 shareholders (6 groups). The first group includes 125 shares (12.5 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 250 shares (25 per cent). Lastly there is the third share allocation (149 shares 14.9 per cent) made up of 4 entities.
Principal place of activity
6 Shaddock Street, Eden Terrace, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: Aia Building, Level 17, 5-7 Byron Ave, Takapuna, Auckland, 0000 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Jul 2011 to 09 Mar 2020
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 06 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 125 | |||
Individual | Schmulian, Rodney Jack |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
09 Jan 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 250 | |||
Individual | Wormald, Garth Warwick |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
15 Dec 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 149 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Sw Trust Services (seven) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033641744 |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2011 - |
Individual | Fullam, Bruce John |
Pukenui Far North 0484 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2011 - |
Individual | Fullam, Debra Ann |
Pukenui Far North 0484 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2011 - |
Director | Bruce John Fullam |
Murrays Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 474 | |||
Individual | Taylor, Rhonda Lois |
Forrest Hill North Shore 0620 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2011 - |
Director | Taylor, Ross Lane |
Forrest Hill North Shore City 0620 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Fullam, Bruce John |
Pukenui Far North 0484 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2011 - |
Director | Bruce John Fullam |
Pukenui Far North 0484 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #6 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Taylor, Ross Lane |
Forrest Hill North Shore City 0620 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2011 - |
Ross Lane Taylor - Director
Appointment date: 11 Jul 2011
Address: Forrest Hill, North Shore City, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Jul 2011
Bruce John Fullam - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Jul 2011
Termination date: 01 Sep 2017
Address: Murrays Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2015
Aragona Limited
Apartment 201, 9 Byron Avenue
Viranda Mayfair Limited
3 Byron Avenue
Viranda Partners Limited
3 Byron Avenue
Property3d Global Limited
3 Byron Avenue
Arcadia Buildings Limited
3 Byron Avenue
Viranda Nominees Limited
3 Byron Avenue
Asg2020 Limited
Aia Building, Level 17
Ehome Nz Limited
3 Byron Avenue
Electrical Testing Services Limited
2nd Floor
Pulse Electrical & Communication Services Limited
3 Byron Ave, Takapuna, Auckland 0622
Sbb Electrical Services Limited
1st Floor
Service House Limited
4 Huron Street