Dgu Limited was launched on 24 Aug 2011 and issued an NZ business number of 9429030973107. This registered LTD company has been run by 1 director, named Christopher John Ryan - an active director whose contract started on 24 Aug 2011.
As stated in BizDb's database (updated on 19 Sep 2024), this company filed 1 address: 2 Arawa Street, Matamata, Matamata, 3400 (types include: registered, physical).
Up to 28 Jul 2022, Dgu Limited had been using 42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville as their physical address.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 2 groups (3 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 900 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Allen Needham Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Morrinsville,
Ryan, Christopher John (a director) located at Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui postcode 3116.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 10% shares (exactly 100 shares) and includes
Ryan, Christopher John - located at Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui. Dgu Limited is categorised as "Architectural aluminium product mfg" (ANZSIC C222305).
Previous address
Address: 42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville, 3300 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 24 Aug 2011 to 28 Jul 2022
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 23 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 900 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Allen Needham Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037244514 |
Morrinsville New Zealand |
31 Jul 2018 - |
Director | Ryan, Christopher John |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
24 Aug 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Ryan, Christopher John |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
24 Aug 2011 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Cooper Aitken Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037059828 Company Number: 1105435 |
Morrinsville 3300 New Zealand |
24 Aug 2011 - 31 Jul 2018 |
Entity | Cooper Aitken Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037059828 Company Number: 1105435 |
Morrinsville 3300 New Zealand |
24 Aug 2011 - 31 Jul 2018 |
Christopher John Ryan - Director
Appointment date: 24 Aug 2011
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 07 May 2021
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 23 May 2017
Miranda Dairy Limited
42 Moorhouse Street
Action Developments (2013) Limited
42 Moorhouse Street
Cms Auto & Marine Upholstery Limited
42 Moorhouse Street
Timesmart Limited
42 Moorhouse Street
Solar Partners Nz Limited
42 Moorhouse Street
Solar Quote Comparison Limited
42 Moorhouse Street
Aluminium Doors & Screens Waikato Limited
Unit 3
Avant Aluminium Limited
Level 1 Caro House
Jutatacon Limited
91 Clarence Street
K A Fabricators Limited
27 Millennium Heights
Regal Aluminium (1988) Limited
102 Kent Street
Spectrum Aluminium (2011) Limited
3 London Street