The Movie Museum Limited was launched on 15 Mar 2012 and issued an NZBN of 9429030747999. This registered LTD company has been run by 4 directors: Peter Robert Jackson - an active director whose contract began on 15 Mar 2012,
Frances Rosemary Walsh - an active director whose contract began on 15 Mar 2012,
Tania Rodger - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Mar 2012 and was terminated on 20 Aug 2020,
Richard Leslie Taylor - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Mar 2012 and was terminated on 20 Aug 2020.
According to the BizDb information (updated on 23 Jul 2024), this company uses 2 addresses: 36 Para Street, Miramar, Wellington, 6022 (office address),
141 Park Road, Miramar, Wellington, 6022 (physical address),
141 Park Road, Miramar, Wellington, 6022 (registered address),
141 Park Road, Miramar, Wellington, 6022 (service address) among others.
Up to 03 Dec 2018, The Movie Museum Limited had been using 141 Park Road, Miramar, Wellington as their registered address.
BizDb found other names for this company: from 15 Mar 2012 to 16 Oct 2013 they were named The Film Museum Limited.
A total of 120 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 60 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Wingnut Group Management Limited (an entity) located at Miramar, Wellington postcode 6022. The Movie Museum Limited is classified as "Museum operation" (ANZSIC R891030).
Principal place of activity
36 Para Street, Miramar, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 141 Park Road, Miramar, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Registered address used from 31 Oct 2017 to 03 Dec 2018
Address #2: 141 Park Road, Miramar, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Physical address used from 30 Oct 2017 to 03 Dec 2018
Address #3: 145 Park Road, Miramar, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Physical address used from 16 Nov 2015 to 30 Oct 2017
Address #4: 145 Park Road, Miramar, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Registered address used from 16 Nov 2015 to 31 Oct 2017
Address #5: 36 Para Street, Miramar, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 15 Mar 2012 to 16 Nov 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 120
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 24 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 60 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Wingnut Group Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047244740 |
Miramar Wellington 6022 New Zealand |
08 Oct 2020 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Berry, Ralph |
Ohakune 4660 New Zealand |
22 Jul 2016 - 08 Oct 2020 |
Director | Walsh, Frances Rosemary |
Miramar Wellington 6022 New Zealand |
21 Jun 2018 - 08 Oct 2020 |
Individual | Rodger, Tania |
Hataitai Wellington 6021 New Zealand |
22 Jul 2016 - 08 Oct 2020 |
Director | Jackson, Peter Robert |
Miramar Wellington 6022 New Zealand |
15 Mar 2012 - 08 Oct 2020 |
Director | Jackson, Peter Robert |
Miramar Wellington 6022 New Zealand |
15 Mar 2012 - 08 Oct 2020 |
Individual | Taylor, Richard Leslie |
Hataitai Wellington 6021 New Zealand |
15 Mar 2012 - 08 Oct 2020 |
Individual | Stephens, Michael George Cantrick |
Wadestown Wellington 6012 New Zealand |
22 Jul 2016 - 21 Jun 2018 |
Individual | Boyens, Philippa Jane |
Miramar Wellington 6022 New Zealand |
21 Jun 2018 - 08 Oct 2020 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Peter Robert Jackson - Director
Appointment date: 15 Mar 2012
Address: Miramar, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Oct 2017
Address: Miramar, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Mar 2012
Frances Rosemary Walsh - Director
Appointment date: 15 Mar 2012
Address: Miramar, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Oct 2017
Address: Miramar, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Mar 2012
Tania Rodger - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Mar 2012
Termination date: 20 Aug 2020
Address: Hataitai, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Mar 2012
Richard Leslie Taylor - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Mar 2012
Termination date: 20 Aug 2020
Address: Hataitai, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Mar 2012
Caravaggio Consulting Limited
40 Para Street
Partisan Limited
22 Ashleigh Crescent
Militaria Auction Limited
48 Para Street
St.petersburg Management Limited
1 Athens Street
Duignan Holdings Limited
27 Ashleigh Crescent
West Mountain Limited
70 Townsend Road
Aotearoa Maori Homestay Limited
92 Nelson Crescent
Marties Red Shed Limited
111 Avenue Road
Metasoft Limited
5b -25 Cuba Street, Tearo
Moto Myles Limited
Whk Nelson
Night Owl Publications Limited
17 Milne Terrace
Story Inc Limited
Level 2 Imperial Buildings