Ht Future Limited was started on 10 Sep 2012 and issued a number of 9429030521513. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Aniva Annie Heem - an active director whose contract began on 10 Sep 2012,
Jay Simon Tupe - an active director whose contract began on 10 Sep 2012.
According to our database (updated on 05 Sep 2024), the company uses 4 addresses: 22 Rimu Road, Oratia, West Auckland, 0604 (service address),
22 Rimu Road, Oratia, West Auckland, 0604 (registered address),
22, Rimu Road, Oratia, Auckland, 0604 (physical address),
22, Rimu Road, Oratia, Auckland, 0604 (service address) among others.
Up to 19 Nov 2020, Ht Future Limited had been using 22, Rimu Road, Oratia, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 500 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Tupe, Jay Simon (a director) located at Massey, Auckland postcode 0614.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 500 shares) and includes
Heem, Annie Aniva - located at Rimu Road, Oratia, West Auckland. Ht Future Limited has been categorised as "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 22 Rimu Road, Oratia, West Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Service address used from 16 Nov 2023
Principal place of activity
22, Rimu Road Oratia, West Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 22, Rimu Road, Oratia, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Registered address used from 18 Nov 2020 to 19 Nov 2020
Address #2: 22, Rimu Road, Oratia, West Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Registered address used from 16 Nov 2020 to 18 Nov 2020
Address #3: 22 Rimu Road, Oratia, West Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Physical address used from 13 Nov 2020 to 16 Nov 2020
Address #4: 22 Rimu Road, Oratia, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Registered address used from 13 Nov 2020 to 16 Nov 2020
Address #5: 22 Rimu Road, Oratia, Glendene, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Registered address used from 20 Mar 2020 to 13 Nov 2020
Address #6: 22 Rimu Road, Oratia, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Physical address used from 02 Mar 2020 to 13 Nov 2020
Address #7: 22 Rimu Road, Oratia, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Registered address used from 02 Mar 2020 to 20 Mar 2020
Address #8: 4178b Great North Road, Glendene, Auckland, 0602 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 Nov 2013 to 02 Mar 2020
Address #9: 2a Baldwin Avenue, Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Sep 2012 to 20 Nov 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 08 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Director | Tupe, Jay Simon |
Massey Auckland 0614 New Zealand |
10 Sep 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Director | Heem, Annie Aniva |
Rimu Road, Oratia West Auckland 0604 New Zealand |
10 Sep 2012 - |
Aniva Annie Heem - Director
Appointment date: 10 Sep 2012
Address: Oratia, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 2022
Address: Rimu Road, Oratia, West Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Nov 2020
Address: Glendene, Auckland, 0602 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Sep 2012
Jay Simon Tupe - Director
Appointment date: 10 Sep 2012
Address: Massey, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Nov 2013
Address: Oratia, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Oct 2017
Te Rautahi Cultural Trust
4172a Great North Road
Zabonne Holdings Limited
4271 Great North Road
Reliance Trading Group Limited
4279a Great North Road
Anugrah J.k. Limited
25 Waitaki Street
Qhj Fashion Limited
12 Manhattan Heights
Clj Company Limited
39 Waitaki Street
Bhuthadia Limited
16 Felgrove Street
Ht Property Solutions Limited
4178b Great North Road
Joyful Investment Limited
5a Dallow Place
Mishka Enterprise Limited
64 Manhattan Heights
Our Venture Limited
1 Dallow Place
Toriona Limited
9a Pakira Avenue