Jc Van De Ven Contractors Limited was incorporated on 27 Sep 2012 and issued a number of 9429030496798. This in liquidation LTD company has been run by 1 director, named Jamie William Van De Ven - an active director whose contract began on 27 Sep 2012.
According to our database (updated on 10 Sep 2024), this company filed 1 address: Suite 4, 35 Grey Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (type: registered, service).
Up until 03 Sep 2021, Jc Van De Ven Contractors Limited had been using 104 Sealey Street, Thames, Thames as their physical address.
BizDb found more names for this company: from 27 Sep 2012 to 30 Aug 2016 they were named Jc Van De Ven Farms Limited.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 99 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Van De Ven, Jamie William (a director) located at Wharekaho, Whitianga postcode 3510.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 1 per cent shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Van De Ven, Candice - located at Wharekaho, Whitianga. Jc Van De Ven Contractors Limited has been classified as "Building, house construction" (ANZSIC E301120).
Other active addresses
Address #4: Suite 4, 35 Grey Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 27 Aug 2024
Principal place of activity
104 Sealey Street, Thames, Thames, 3500 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 104 Sealey Street, Thames, Thames, 3500 New Zealand
Physical address used from 15 Apr 2021 to 03 Sep 2021
Address #2: 104 Sealey Street, Thames, Thames, 3500 New Zealand
Registered address used from 22 Apr 2020 to 03 Sep 2021
Address #3: 309b Pollen Street, Thames, Thames, 3500 New Zealand
Registered address used from 13 Apr 2018 to 22 Apr 2020
Address #4: 309b Pollen Street, Thames, Thames, 3500 New Zealand
Physical address used from 13 Apr 2018 to 15 Apr 2021
Address #5: 309b Pollen Street, Thames, Thames, 3500 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 27 Sep 2012 to 13 Apr 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 30 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Director | Van De Ven, Jamie William |
Wharekaho Whitianga 3510 New Zealand |
27 Sep 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Van De Ven, Candice |
Wharekaho Whitianga 3510 New Zealand |
01 Sep 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Bloom, Candice |
Whitianga Whitianga 3510 New Zealand |
27 Sep 2012 - 01 Sep 2016 |
Jamie William Van De Ven - Director
Appointment date: 27 Sep 2012
Address: Wharekaho, Whitianga, 3510 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Apr 2023
Address: Whitianga, Whitianga, 3510 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Aug 2016
Thames Farm & Industrial Supplies (2003) Limited
311 Pollen Street
Read Bros Hardware Limited
308 Pollen Street
Waiwhenua Consultants Limited
Hauraki Taxation Services
La Vada Hair Limited
328 Pollen Street
Micmat Limited
328 Pollen Street
Jac Vansi Limited
328 Pollen Street
Brett Builders Limited
309b Pollen Street
Lovell Construction Limited
309b Pollen Street
Mackenzie Construction (2014) Limited
413 Pollen Street
Matt Sullivan Builders Limited
309b Pollen Street
Pacific Building Consultants Limited
309b Pollen Street
Tr & Aj Mackenzie Limited
413 Pollen Street