Mwis 2013 Limited was registered on 13 Feb 2013 and issued an NZBN of 9429030348745. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Andrew James Golightly - an active director whose contract began on 13 Feb 2013,
Danny James Tuato'o - an active director whose contract began on 14 Feb 2018,
Michael Bevan Smith - an inactive director whose contract began on 13 Feb 2013 and was terminated on 14 Feb 2018.
As stated in BizDb's information (last updated on 17 Sep 2024), the company registered 1 address: 122 Bank Street, Whangarei, 0110 (category: postal, office).
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Tuato'o, Danny James (an individual) located at Rd 4, Parua Bay postcode 0174.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Golightly, Andrew James - located at Regent, Whangarei. Mwis 2013 Limited was categorised as "Legal service" (business classification M693130).
Principal place of activity
122 Bank Street, Whangarei, 0110 New Zealand
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 01 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Tuato'o, Danny James |
Rd 4 Parua Bay 0174 New Zealand |
14 Feb 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Golightly, Andrew James |
Regent Whangarei 0112 New Zealand |
13 Feb 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Smith, Michael Bevan |
Whangarei 0110 New Zealand |
13 Feb 2013 - 14 Feb 2018 |
Director | Michael Bevan Smith |
Whangarei 0110 New Zealand |
13 Feb 2013 - 14 Feb 2018 |
Andrew James Golightly - Director
Appointment date: 13 Feb 2013
Address: Whangarei, 0110 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Feb 2013
Address: Regent, Whangarei, 0112 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Feb 2018
Danny James Tuato'o - Director
Appointment date: 14 Feb 2018
Address: Rd 4, Parua Bay, 0174 New Zealand
Address used since 17 May 2018
Address: Rd 4, Whangarei Heads, 0174 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Feb 2018
Michael Bevan Smith - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Feb 2013
Termination date: 14 Feb 2018
Address: Whangarei, 0110 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Feb 2013
Mwis 2012 Limited
122 Bank Street
S & J Perkins Trustees Limited
122 Bank Street
Mwis 2011 Limited
122 Bank Street
Mwis 2010 Limited
122 Bank Street
Phantom Place Limited
122 Bank Street
Mwis 2014 Limited
122 Bank Street
Mansfield Services Limited
123-125 Bank Street
Mwis 2014 Limited
122 Bank Street
Mwis 2015 Limited
122 Bank Street
Mwis 2016 Limited
122 Bank Street
Mwis 2017 Limited
122 Bank Street
Powell Trustees Limited
122 Bank Street