Dm Commercial Holdings Limited, a registered company, was launched on 25 Feb 2013. 9429030335004 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Investment - commercial property" (ANZSIC L671230) is how the company was classified. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Matthew Mcneill - an active director whose contract began on 25 Feb 2013,
David Watchorn - an active director whose contract began on 25 Feb 2013.
Updated on 04 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 143 Idris Road, Strowan, Christchurch, 8053 (category: registered, service).
Dm Commercial Holdings Limited had been using 24 Park Terrace, Corsair Bay, Lyttelton as their physical address up until 11 Aug 2016.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 4 shareholders (4 groups). The first group includes 498 shares (49.8%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (0.1%). Lastly the 3rd share allotment (1 share 0.1%) made up of 1 entity.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 143 Idris Road, Strowan, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 12 Sep 2023
Previous address
Address #1: 24 Park Terrace, Corsair Bay, Lyttelton, 8082 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 25 Feb 2013 to 11 Aug 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 04 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 498 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Aspiring Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049014402 |
Strowan Christchurch 8052 New Zealand |
31 Mar 2023 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Mcneill, Matthew |
Newport Nsw 2106 Australia |
03 Mar 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Mcneill, Caroline |
Newport Nsw 2106 Australia |
25 Feb 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Director | Watchorn, David |
Lyttelton Lyttelton 8082 New Zealand |
25 Feb 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mcneill, Matthew |
Scarborough Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
03 Mar 2014 - 31 Mar 2023 |
Entity | France Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032555264 Company Number: 2173949 |
Middleton Christchurch 8024 New Zealand |
17 May 2016 - 31 Mar 2023 |
Individual | Mcneill, Caroline |
Scarborough Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
03 Mar 2014 - 31 Mar 2023 |
Individual | Mcneill, Caroline |
Scarborough Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
03 Mar 2014 - 31 Mar 2023 |
Entity | Godfreys Trustees 2013 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030328044 Company Number: 4328698 |
30 Aug 2014 - 17 May 2016 | |
Individual | Mcdonald, Brad |
Sydenham Christchurch 8011 New Zealand |
03 Mar 2014 - 30 Aug 2014 |
Entity | Godfreys Trustees 2013 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030328044 Company Number: 4328698 |
30 Aug 2014 - 17 May 2016 |
Matthew Mcneill - Director
Appointment date: 25 Feb 2013
Address: Nsw, 2106 Australia
Address used since 04 Sep 2023
Address: Scarborough, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Aug 2016
David Watchorn - Director
Appointment date: 25 Feb 2013
Address: Lyttelton, Lyttelton, 8082 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Feb 2013
Dmc Commercial Holdings Limited
5 Flowers Track
Visual Eyes New Zealand Limited
5 Flowers Track
The Joy Crumpton House For Terminally Ill Trust
123 Scarborough Road
Local Heroes Trust
C/-dr S M Wakefield
Harrow Investments Limited
27 Scarborough Road
Victoria 88 Limited
33 Scarborough Road
354 Ferry Road Limited
8 Godley Drive
7 Winston Limited
8 Godley Drive
Dmc Commercial Holdings Limited
5 Flowers Track
Ip Group Limited
8 Godley Drive
Masters Theatre Properties Limited
11 Duncan Street
Tarnbrae Investments Limited
68 Taylor's Mistake Road