Myland Partners (Nz) Limited was registered on 26 Feb 2013 and issued a number of 9429030332669. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 4 directors: Johannes Lodewikus Pretorius Cilliers - an active director whose contract started on 16 Dec 2019,
Farhad Moinfar - an inactive director whose contract started on 26 Feb 2013 and was terminated on 01 May 2020,
Dene Peter Biddlecombe - an inactive director whose contract started on 16 Dec 2016 and was terminated on 08 Feb 2019,
Andrew James Fawcet - an inactive director whose contract started on 26 Feb 2013 and was terminated on 10 May 2017.
As stated in BizDb's database (last updated on 24 Aug 2024), this company filed 1 address: Level 8, 55-56 Shortland Street,, Auckland, 1011 (type: registered, physical).
Up until 24 Mar 2022, Myland Partners (Nz) Limited had been using 143 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland as their physical address.
BizDb identified old names used by this company: from 25 Feb 2013 to 13 Feb 2014 they were named Tholos Limited.
A total of 75 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 75 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Safe Haven Corporate Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Ponsonby, Auckland postcode 1011. Myland Partners (Nz) Limited has been classified as "Land development or subdivision (excluding buildings construction)" (business classification E321110).
Previous addresses
Address: 143 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1140 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 Apr 2017 to 24 Mar 2022
Address: 39 Union Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 22 Oct 2014 to 10 Apr 2017
Address: Level 2, 5 High Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Feb 2013 to 22 Oct 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 75
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 25 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 75 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Safe Haven Corporate Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041951842 |
Ponsonby Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
26 Aug 2020 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Moinfar, Farhad |
Saint Marys Bay Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
26 Feb 2013 - 15 Dec 2016 |
Entity | Ursus Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041071410 Company Number: 4920659 |
Princes Wharf, 143 Quay Street Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
15 Dec 2016 - 26 Aug 2020 |
Individual | Fawcet, Jonathan Alan Thomas |
Belmont Lower Hutt 5010 New Zealand |
26 Feb 2013 - 26 Aug 2020 |
Entity | Ursus Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041071410 Company Number: 4920659 |
Princes Wharf, 143 Quay Street Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
15 Dec 2016 - 26 Aug 2020 |
Entity | Ecd Trustees 2253 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030346390 Company Number: 4291738 |
26 Feb 2013 - 15 Dec 2016 | |
Entity | Ecd Trustees 2253 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030346390 Company Number: 4291738 |
26 Feb 2013 - 15 Dec 2016 |
Johannes Lodewikus Pretorius Cilliers - Director
Appointment date: 16 Dec 2019
Address: Gulf Harbour, Whangaparaoa, 0930 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Apr 2023
Address: Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Dec 2019
Farhad Moinfar - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Feb 2013
Termination date: 01 May 2020
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Mar 2015
Dene Peter Biddlecombe - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Dec 2016
Termination date: 08 Feb 2019
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1041 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Dec 2016
Andrew James Fawcet - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Feb 2013
Termination date: 10 May 2017
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Jan 2017
Paradise Bay Investments Limited
Shed 24 Princes Wharf, Lobby 2, Level 1
Paradise Trust Company Limited
Shed 24 Princes Wharf, Lobby 2, Level 1
Spinnaker Capital Limited
Shed 24, Princes Wharf, Lobby 2, Level 1
Taupo Heights Developments Limited
Shed 24, Princes Wharf, Lobby 2, Level 1
Bee Bop New Zealand Limited
Apartment 17, 143 Quay Street
Efu Investment Limited
8/143 Quay Street
184 Maraetai Rd Limited
Shed 24, Princes Wharf
Callisto One Limited
143 Quay Street
Captivate Properties Limited
C/-lowthers Auckland Ltd
Fountain Group Limited
188 Quay Street
Seismic Performance Holdings Limited
Shed 24, Princes Wharf, Lobby 2, Level 1
Western City Holdings Limited
143 Quay Street