Mountainview Medical Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 15 Apr 2013. 9429030262980 is the number it was issued. "Clinic - medical - general practice" (business classification Q851110) is how the company was categorised. This company has been managed by 4 directors: Maria Magdalena Bezuidenhout - an active director whose contract began on 15 Apr 2013,
Kirsten Ann Cameron - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Apr 2013 and was terminated on 16 Dec 2016,
Robert William Elliott Mellish - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Apr 2013 and was terminated on 31 Dec 2015,
Paul Robert Bond - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Apr 2013 and was terminated on 31 Dec 2015.
Last updated on 24 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 67 High Street, Hawera, Hawera, 4610 (type: registered, physical).
Mountainview Medical Limited had been using 56 Leach Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth as their registered address up until 05 May 2022.
A total of 30000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 29700 shares (99 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 300 shares (1 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 56 Leach Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 03 May 2021 to 05 May 2022
Address #2: 56 Leach Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 03 Jan 2014 to 03 May 2021
Address #3: 155 Devon Street East, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Registered address used from 08 May 2013 to 03 Jan 2014
Address #4: 155 Devon Street East, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Registered address used from 15 Apr 2013 to 08 May 2013
Address #5: 155 Devon Street East, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Physical address used from 15 Apr 2013 to 03 Jan 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 30000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 05 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 29700 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Marlene Bezuidenhout Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049517750 |
Rd 12 Hawera 4672 New Zealand |
27 Apr 2022 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 300 | |||
Director | Bezuidenhout, Maria Magdalena |
Hawera 4672 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Cameron, Devon |
Hawera Hawera 4610 New Zealand |
24 Jul 2015 - 17 May 2017 |
Individual | Metcalfe, Selwyn James |
Hawera Hawera 4610 New Zealand |
24 Jul 2015 - 27 Apr 2022 |
Individual | Cameron, Kirsten Ann |
Hawera Hawera 4610 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2013 - 17 May 2017 |
Entity | Yhpj Trustees (2005) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034728628 Company Number: 1641965 |
24 Jul 2015 - 17 May 2017 | |
Individual | Mellish, Robert William Elliott |
Rd 12 Hawera 4672 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2013 - 25 May 2016 |
Individual | Bond, Paul Robert |
Hawera Hawera 4610 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2013 - 25 May 2016 |
Director | Paul Robert Bond |
Hawera Hawera 4610 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2013 - 25 May 2016 |
Entity | Yhpj Trustees (2005) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034728628 Company Number: 1641965 |
24 Jul 2015 - 17 May 2017 | |
Director | Robert William Elliott Mellish |
Rd 12 Hawera 4672 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2013 - 25 May 2016 |
Director | Kirsten Ann Cameron |
Hawera Hawera 4610 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2013 - 17 May 2017 |
Maria Magdalena Bezuidenhout - Director
Appointment date: 15 Apr 2013
Address: Hawera, 4672 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Aug 2020
Address: Hawera, Hawera, 4610 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Apr 2013
Kirsten Ann Cameron - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Apr 2013
Termination date: 16 Dec 2016
Address: Hawera, Hawera, 4610 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Apr 2013
Robert William Elliott Mellish - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Apr 2013
Termination date: 31 Dec 2015
Address: Rd 12, Hawera, 4672 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Apr 2013
Paul Robert Bond - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Apr 2013
Termination date: 31 Dec 2015
Address: Hawera, Hawera, 4610 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Apr 2013
Windy Farms (awarua) Trustee Limited
56 Leach Street
Efs Trustee (2013) Limited
56 Leach Street
M Duynhoven Trustees Limited
56 Leach
Maravu Holdings Limited
56 Leach Street
Mokosoi Holdings Limited
56 Leach Street
Kc Bulman Nominees Limited
56 Leach Street
Anapoona Limited
279 Wicksteed Street
Dalman Doctors Limited
58 Shelter Grove
Eastcare Medical Limited
249 Wicksteed Street
Full Circle Medical Limited
369 Devon Street
Raglan Medical Limited
12 Wallis Street
Tms Medical Limited
249 Wicksteed Street