Cathart Trustees Limited, a registered company, was launched on 29 Apr 2013. 9429030244405 is the number it was issued. "Business administrative service" (ANZSIC N729110) is how the company has been categorised. This company has been run by 6 directors: Atanas Dimitrof - an active director whose contract started on 29 Apr 2013,
Atanas Dimitrov - an active director whose contract started on 29 Apr 2013,
Catherine Dimitrov - an active director whose contract started on 29 Apr 2013,
Renee Frances Brown - an active director whose contract started on 03 Oct 2014,
Caleb Ljubo Dimitrov - an active director whose contract started on 03 Oct 2014.
Updated on 27 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 1 Lorne Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 (type: registered, physical).
Cathart Trustees Limited had been using 437 Rickit Road, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu as their registered address up to 13 Oct 2014.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 50 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Previous address
Address: 437 Rickit Road, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 29 Apr 2013 to 13 Oct 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 15 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Dimitrof, Atanas |
Baynton 6714 Australia |
26 Mar 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Dimitrov, Catherine |
Baynton 6714 Australia |
29 Apr 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Dimitrov, Atanas |
Baynton 6714 Australia |
29 Apr 2013 - 26 Mar 2021 |
Atanas Dimitrof - Director
Appointment date: 29 Apr 2013
Address: Baynton, 6714 Australia
Address used since 01 Apr 2016
Atanas Dimitrov - Director
Appointment date: 29 Apr 2013
Address: Baynton, 6714 Australia
Address used since 01 Apr 2016
Catherine Dimitrov - Director
Appointment date: 29 Apr 2013
Address: Bayton, 6714 Australia
Address used since 01 Apr 2016
Renee Frances Brown - Director
Appointment date: 03 Oct 2014
Address: Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Oct 2014
Caleb Ljubo Dimitrov - Director
Appointment date: 03 Oct 2014
Address: Baynton, 6714 Australia
Address used since 04 Apr 2018
Address: Rd 6, Te Awamutu, 3876 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Oct 2014
Renee Francis Brown - Director
Appointment date: 03 Oct 2014
Address: Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Oct 2014
Npr Properties Limited
1 Lorne Street
Hamilton Futures Limited
425 Kihikihi Road
T J M Homes Limited
1073 Bank Street
Paull's Design Services Limited
211 Fraser Street
Te Awamutu Country Variety Club (incorporated)
155 Fraser Street
Watson Haworth Motors Limited
88 Kihikihi Rd
Lj Wilkinson Limited
70 Albert Park Drive
Qubik Management Limited
70 Albert Park Drive
Rewi Trustees Limited
115 Rewi Street
Spectrum Group Services Limited
486 Alexandra Street
The Hwm Trading Company Limited
206 Puniu Rd
X3 Limited
468 Mandeno St