Vq Holdings Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 11 Jul 2013. 9429030144576 is the number it was issued. "Investment - commercial property" (business classification L671230) is how the company is classified. The company has been run by 5 directors: Connel Craig Mclaren - an active director whose contract started on 11 Jul 2013,
Brett Allan Russell - an active director whose contract started on 11 Jul 2013,
Kerin Suzanne Russell-Smith - an active director whose contract started on 02 Sep 2013,
Scott Russell Mclaren - an active director whose contract started on 02 Sep 2013,
Kerin Russell-Smith - an active director whose contract started on 02 Sep 2013.
Last updated on 16 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (types include: registered, physical).
Vq Holdings Limited had been using Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland as their physical address up to 19 Sep 2019.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 500 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 500 shares (50%).
Previous addresses
Address: Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 01 Apr 2019 to 19 Sep 2019
Address: Level 10, 203 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 23 Oct 2014 to 01 Apr 2019
Address: Moore Stephens Markhams Auckland, Level 10, 203 Queen Street, Auckland, 1140 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 11 Jul 2013 to 23 Oct 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 25 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Brickhouse Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030327719 |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Mfh Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030620186 |
4 Graham Street Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2013 - |
Connel Craig Mclaren - Director
Appointment date: 11 Jul 2013
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Jul 2013
Address: Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Jul 2013
Brett Allan Russell - Director
Appointment date: 11 Jul 2013
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Sep 2020
Address: Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Jul 2013
Kerin Suzanne Russell-smith - Director
Appointment date: 02 Sep 2013
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Aug 2022
Scott Russell Mclaren - Director
Appointment date: 02 Sep 2013
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Sep 2023
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Sep 2013
Kerin Russell-smith - Director
Appointment date: 02 Sep 2013
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Aug 2022
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Sep 2013
Virtusa Consulting & Services Pty Ltd
Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road
Kiran M Bhikha Limited
Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road
Wilson Partners (sharp) Trustee Limited
Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road
Home Healthcare Equipment Limited
Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road
Asaleo Holdings New Zealand Limited
Level 2
Wilson Partners (grochowicz) Trustees Limited
Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road
Brickhouse Holdings Limited
Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road
Deborah Chambers Limited
Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road
Horton Media Australia Limited
Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road
Horton Media Properties Limited
Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road
Mcfad Holdings Limited
Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road
Phoenix Foundation Trustee Company Limited
Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road