Southern Lakes Area Investments Limited was incorporated on 01 Aug 2013 and issued a number of 9429030115811. The removed LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Craig Emerson Speakman - an active director whose contract began on 28 Oct 2016,
David Wallace Bain - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Aug 2013 and was terminated on 26 Jan 2017,
Kerry Christian - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Oct 2013 and was terminated on 08 Nov 2013.
According to our database (last updated on 18 Jul 2024), the company filed 1 address: 161 Makakau Rd, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 (category: registered, physical).
Until 15 Mar 2016, Southern Lakes Area Investments Limited had been using Haupapa Street, Rotorua as their physical address.
BizDb found previous names for the company: from 01 Aug 2013 to 07 Mar 2016 they were named Walker Usa Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 1000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Speakman, Craig Emerson (an individual) located at Saint Johns, Auckland postcode 1072.
Previous address
Address: Haupapa Street, Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 01 Aug 2013 to 15 Mar 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 03 Mar 2022
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Speakman, Craig Emerson |
Saint Johns Auckland 1072 New Zealand |
28 Oct 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Bain, David Wallace |
Rotorua 3010 New Zealand |
01 Aug 2013 - 28 Oct 2016 |
Director | David Wallace Bain |
Rotorua 3010 New Zealand |
01 Aug 2013 - 28 Oct 2016 |
Craig Emerson Speakman - Director
Appointment date: 28 Oct 2016
Address: Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Oct 2016
David Wallace Bain - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Aug 2013
Termination date: 26 Jan 2017
Address: Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Mar 2016
Kerry Christian - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Oct 2013
Termination date: 08 Nov 2013
Address: Queenstown-lakes, 9300 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Oct 2013
Kd Stephenson Trustees Limited
Level 2
Parbury Limited
Level 2
Nz Limousines Limited
161 Manukau Road
Corporate Cabs Limited
161 Manukau Road
Corporate Cabs (wellington 1998) Limited
161 Manukau Road
Health Pharmacy Group Limited
161 Makakau Rd,