Hglaw Trustees 114 Limited, a registered company, was registered on 08 Oct 2013. 9429030028517 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is how the company was categorised. This company has been managed by 3 directors: Gavin Neil Arnet - an active director whose contract began on 22 Apr 2018,
John Gray Robertson - an inactive director whose contract began on 08 Oct 2013 and was terminated on 22 Apr 2018,
Carol Ann Robertson - an inactive director whose contract began on 08 Oct 2013 and was terminated on 22 Apr 2018.
Updated on 18 Sep 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 3 addresses the company registered, namely: 21D Belgium Street, Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 (physical address),
21D Belgium Street, Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 (registered address),
21D Belgium Street, Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 (service address),
Po Box 295, Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1843 (postal address) among others.
Hglaw Trustees 114 Limited had been using 21D Belgium Street, Ostend, Waiheke Island as their registered address up to 07 Oct 2020.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Arnet, Gavin Neil - located at 1081, Pukekohe, Pukekohe.
Principal place of activity
21d Belgium Street, Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 21d Belgium Street, Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 03 Sep 2019 to 07 Oct 2020
Address #2: 21d Belgium Street, Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 08 Oct 2013 to 03 Sep 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 02 Sep 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Arnet, Gavin Neil |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 New Zealand |
22 Apr 2018 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Robertson, John Gray |
Ostend Waiheke Island 1081 New Zealand |
08 Oct 2013 - 22 Apr 2018 |
Gavin Neil Arnet - Director
Appointment date: 22 Apr 2018
Address: Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2023
Address: Bombay, 2675 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Apr 2018
Address: Rd 1, Bombay, 2675 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Aug 2019
John Gray Robertson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Oct 2013
Termination date: 22 Apr 2018
Address: Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Oct 2013
Carol Ann Robertson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Oct 2013
Termination date: 22 Apr 2018
Address: Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Oct 2013
Waiheke Physiotherapy Limited
21e Belgium Street
Manak Enterprises Limited
1/23 Beigium Street
Vets On Waiheke (2014) Limited
30 Putiki Road
Gilmore Investments Limited
30 Putiki Road
The Catherine Mitchell Arts Centre Incorporated
32 Putiki Road
Ivory Trading Limited
16 Belgium Street
Hglaw Trustees 103 Limited
21d Belgium Street
Hglaw Trustees 108 Limited
21d Belgium Street
Hglaw Trustees 110 Limited
21d Belgium Street
Hglaw Trustees 112 Limited
21d Belgium Street
Hglaw Trustees 118 Limited
21d Belgium Street
Robyn Jones Trustees Limited
21d Belgium Street